This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2021 at 08:59:47 (UTC).

Villamar v. Carrier Compliance Services Corp

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Villamar filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Carrier Compliance Services Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-20573

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nilo Villamar

Defendants

Carrier Compliance Services Corp

Unique Freight Lines, Inc.

RoadTex Transportation Corp.

David Padron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Noah E Storch

Attorney at Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 West State Road 84, Suite 103

Davie, FL 33324

Alexander Thomas Harne

Attorney at Richard Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 West State Road 84, #103

Davie, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Todd William Shulby

Attorney at Todd W. Shulby, P.A.

1792 Bell Tower Lane

Weston, FL 33326

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Compliance Services Corp, David Padron, RoadTex Transportation Corp., Unique Freight Lines, Inc. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#17

(#17) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Carrier Compliance Services Corp, David Padron, RoadTex Transportation Corp., Unique Freight Lines, Inc. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd William Shulby on behalf of Carrier Compliance Services Corp, David Padron, RoadTex Transportation Corp., Unique Freight Lines, Inc.. Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party Carrier Compliance Services Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party David Padron(pty:dft), Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party RoadTex Transportation Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party Unique Freight Lines, Inc.(pty:dft). (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RoadTex Transportation Corp., David Padron, Unique Freight Lines, Inc., Carrier Compliance Services Corp. Unique Freight Lines, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RoadTex Transportation Corp., David Padron, Unique Freight Lines, Inc., Carrier Compliance Services Corp. RoadTex Transportation Corp. waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RoadTex Transportation Corp., David Padron, Unique Freight Lines, Inc., Carrier Compliance Services Corp. David Padron waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#10

(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nilo Villamar.(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#9

(#9) Statement of: Claim by Nilo Villamar re 8 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,,,,,,, (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Nilo Villamar (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Nilo Villamar (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of Nilo Villamar. Attorney Alexander Thomas Harne added to party Nilo Villamar(pty:pla). (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Carrier Compliance Services Corp. (ebz) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carrier Compliance Services Corp. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14368554, filed by Nilo Villamar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Compliance Services Corp, David Padron, RoadTex Transportation Corp., Unique Freight Lines, Inc. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Carrier Compliance Services Corp, David Padron, RoadTex Transportation Corp., Unique Freight Lines, Inc. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd William Shulby on behalf of Carrier Compliance Services Corp, David Padron, RoadTex Transportation Corp., Unique Freight Lines, Inc.. Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party Carrier Compliance Services Corp(pty:dft), Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party David Padron(pty:dft), Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party RoadTex Transportation Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd William Shulby added to party Unique Freight Lines, Inc.(pty:dft). (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RoadTex Transportation Corp., David Padron, Unique Freight Lines, Inc., Carrier Compliance Services Corp. Unique Freight Lines, Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RoadTex Transportation Corp., David Padron, Unique Freight Lines, Inc., Carrier Compliance Services Corp. RoadTex Transportation Corp. waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RoadTex Transportation Corp., David Padron, Unique Freight Lines, Inc., Carrier Compliance Services Corp. David Padron waiver sent on 4/2/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Shulby, Todd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to David Padron, RoadTex Transportation Corp., Unique Freight Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Nilo Villamar re #10 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal of Filing Proposed Summons to be Issued (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Unique Freight Lines, Inc., #2 Summon(s) RoadTex Transportation Corp., #3 Summon(s) David Padron) (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nilo Villamar.(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of: Claim by Nilo Villamar re 8 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,,,,,,, (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq. ("FLSA"). In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED to comply with the following procedures: Under Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a plaintiff is required to state a "short and plain statement of the claim." While this Rule places only a light burden on a plaintiff, the Court requires complaints filed under the FLSA to include, at a minimum, a statement setting forth the following with respect to each Plaintiff: (a) An initial estimate of the total amount of alleged unpaid wages; (b) A preliminary calculation of such wages; (c) The approximate period during which the alleged FLSA violations occurred; and (d) The nature of the wages (e.g., overtime or straight time). Plaintiff is directed to file a "Statement of Claim" by March 15, 2021. Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order, the Statement of Claim, and copies of all supporting documents (including time sheets, pay stubs, etc.) upon counsel for Defendant once an appearance has been made or at the time the Statement of Claim is filed (if defense counsel has already appeared). Defendant(s) shall then file a "Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Claim" setting forth in detail any defenses to Plaintiff's claim(s) and serve copies of all supporting documents within twenty (20) days of being served with Plaintiff's Statement of Claim. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 02/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 02/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Nilo Villamar (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Nilo Villamar (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of Nilo Villamar. Attorney Alexander Thomas Harne added to party Nilo Villamar(pty:pla). (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Carrier Compliance Services Corp. (ebz) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carrier Compliance Services Corp. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14368554, filed by Nilo Villamar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIQUE FREIGHT LINES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROADTEX TRANSPORTATION CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Thomas Harne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah E. Storch