This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:37:35 (UTC).

Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc. v. Allied Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allied Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc.

Defendant

Allied Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hunter Milam Klein

Attorney at Green Klein & Wood

408 E. 7Th Street

Houston, TX 77007

Robert Dale Green

Attorney at Green Klein & Wood

408 E. 7Th Street

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick M Kemp

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

100 Congress Avenue, Suite 800

Austin, TX 78701

Robert Glen Wall

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd

100 Congress Ave, Suite 800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Additional Page(s) State court file and docket sheet

#11

(#11) Supplemental Document by Allied Insurance Company of America as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Supplement to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) State court file and docket sheet) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/23/2022) (dsr) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/23/2022) (dsr) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel (Unopposed) filed by Allied Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION To Appear without Designating Local Counsel filed by Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join other parties and amend the pleadings must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on September 15, 2022. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on May 15, 2023. The parties must take this case to mediation which must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on May 15, 2023. The mediator must file a report to the Court within seven (7) days from the completion of mediation. Motions in limine must be filed and discovery must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on March 25, 2024. This case is set for trial at 9:00 a.m. on April 15, 2024, in the United States Courtroom, O.C. Fisher Federal Building, 33 East Twohig Avenue, San Angelo, Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/10/2022) (pnp) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Additional Page(s) Index of Matters for Removal

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Allied Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12792891) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Additional Page(s) Index of Matters for Removal, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Supplemental Document by Allied Insurance Company of America as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Supplement to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) State court file and docket sheet) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/23/2022) (dsr) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Proceed without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/23/2022) (dsr) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel (Unopposed) filed by Allied Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION To Appear without Designating Local Counsel filed by Village Shopping Center Condo Property Owners Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Hunter) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join other parties and amend the pleadings must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on September 15, 2022. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on May 15, 2023. The parties must take this case to mediation which must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on May 15, 2023. The mediator must file a report to the Court within seven (7) days from the completion of mediation. Motions in limine must be filed and discovery must be completed by 3:00 p.m. on March 25, 2024. This case is set for trial at 9:00 a.m. on April 15, 2024, in the United States Courtroom, O.C. Fisher Federal Building, 33 East Twohig Avenue, San Angelo, Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 5/10/2022) (pnp) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (pnp) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied Insurance Company of America. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Wall, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Allied Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12792891) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Additional Page(s) Index of Matters for Removal, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Kemp, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Glen Wall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick M. Kemp