This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:05:09 (UTC).

Village at the Beverly, LLC v. Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Village at the Beverly, LLC filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T. Parker and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00055

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Village at the Beverly, LLC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Michael T. Sullivan

LRK, Inc.

Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.

Superior Insulation of the Gulf Coast, LLC

Loan Oak Construction

3Rd Party Defendants

NV Construction LLC

Superior Insulation of the Gulf Coast, LLC

Bigford Enterprises, Inc.

Loan Oak Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cody C. Bailey

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Jacob A. Bradley

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Leslie M. Hand

Attorney at LLOYD, GRAY, WHITEHEAD & MONROE, PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

Patrick Patronas

Attorney at LLOYD, GRAY, WHITEHEAD & MONROE, PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

Leah Nichols Ledford

Attorney at SCOTT, SULLIVAN, STREETMAN & FOX - Jackson

P. O. Box 13847, 730 Avignon Drive, Suite 101 (39157)

Jackson, MS 39236-3847

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Roy A. Smith, Jr.

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL - Jackson

P.O. Box 1084, 4400 Old Canton Road, Suite 400 (39211)

Jackson, MS 39215

Robert Brantley Adams

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL - Jackson

P.O. Box 1084, 4400 Old Canton Road, Suite 400 (39211)

Jackson, MS 39215

Richard O. Burson

Attorney at BURSON, ENTREKIN, ORR, MITCHELL & LACEY, PA

P. O. Box 1289, 535 North Fifth Avenue (39440)

Laurel, MS 39441-1289

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#17

14 #4

Exhibit D - LRK Letter

14 #3

Exhibit C - Contract with Sullivan/LRK

#14

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

State Court Summons - Empire Corporation

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Loan Oak Construction (Burson, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, by Loan Oak Construction.(Burson, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, by Bigford Enterprises, Inc..(Smith, Roy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brantley Adams on behalf of Bigford Enterprises, Inc. (Adams, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy A. Smith, Jr on behalf of Bigford Enterprises, Inc. (Smith, Roy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay Proceedings; granting #14 Motion to Compel Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/18/19 (lm) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. Bigford Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #25 : Proof of Service of a summons should be completed and filed with the first page, as issued. Attachment of an Affidavit of Service is not sufficient without completed proof. Attorney is directed to refile. (LDR) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. NV Construction LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc.. Bigford Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Ledford, Leah) Modified on 6/11/2019 (LDR). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) State Court Record by Defendant Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. Volumes 1 (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LRK, Inc. answer due 4/24/2019; Michael T. Sullivan answer due 4/24/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 16, 2019. (js) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. answer due 4/24/2019. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 16, 2019. (js) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LRK, Inc., Michael T. Sullivan (Patronas, Patrick) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. (Ledford, Leah) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Village at the Beverly, LLC (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hand on behalf of LRK, Inc., Michael T. Sullivan (Hand, Leslie) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Since a Notice of Appearance by attorney was not previously filed, the attorney is advised in the future when making an appearance in a case to add himself/herself to the appropriate party and to make sure the correct party/attorney association is made, or in the alternative to file a Notice of Appearance. Correction has been made. (LDR) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by LRK, Inc., Michael T. Sullivan re #1 Notice of Removal,,, (Patronas, Patrick) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Empire Corporation of Tennessee, Inc. from Circuit Court of Forrest County, MS, case number W19-0034. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3963840) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Summons - Empire Corporation)(LDR) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIGFORD ENTERPRISES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where NV CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard O. Burson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roy A. Smith