This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 07:48:47 (UTC).

Erik Villa v. Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Erik Villa filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08733

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erik Villa

Defendants

Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.

Loya Casualty Insurance Company

Does 1 through 500, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew J Joens

Attorney at Joens and Joens APC

2201 Dupont Drive Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92612

Timothy Lea Joens

Attorney at Joens and Joens APC

2201 Dupont Drive Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Kyle LeBeau

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-3598

Ronald D Getchey

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton

501 West Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Charles A Danaher

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

501 West Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV3022, acknowledged on 10/13/2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#16

(#16) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court GRANTS the parties' Stipulation, and REMANDS this action to the Los Angeles Superior Court. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendants Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Getchey, Ronald) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charles A Danaher on behalf of Defendants Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Attorney Charles A Danaher added to party Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles A Danaher added to party Loya Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Danaher, Charles) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

12 #3

Proposed Order

12 #2

Declaration Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Ronald D. Getchey

12 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendant Fred Loya Ins. Agency, Inc.'s Motion to

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Erik Villa, (Joens, Timothy) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (LeBeau, Jared) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (LeBeau, Jared) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #3

Proof of Service

1 #2

Superior Court First Amended Complaint

1 #1

Superior Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV30022 Receipt No: ACACDC-28207890 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Loya Casualty Insurance Company, Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Complaint, #2 Superior Court First Amended Complaint, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Jared Kyle LeBeau added to party Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Kyle LeBeau added to party Loya Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(LeBeau, Jared) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV3022, acknowledged on 10/13/2020. (iv) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court GRANTS the parties' Stipulation, and REMANDS this action to the Los Angeles Superior Court. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendants Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Getchey, Ronald) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Charles A Danaher on behalf of Defendants Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Attorney Charles A Danaher added to party Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles A Danaher added to party Loya Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Danaher, Charles) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint DKT 1-2 filed by Defendant Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Fred Loya Ins. Agency, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Ronald D. Getchey, #3 Proposed Order) (Getchey, Ronald) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint DKT 1-2 filed by Defendant Loya Casualty Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Loya Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action, #2 Proposed Order) (Getchey, Ronald) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Motions #8 , #9 , for the following reasons: Incorrect event selected. Hearing information missing, incorrect, or not timely. (iv) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **STRICKEN** NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Ronald D. Getchey, #3 Proposed Order)(Getchey, Ronald) Modified on 9/30/2020 Per Order #10 . (iv). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **STRICKEN** NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Causes of action filed by Defendant Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant Loya Casualty Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss the First, Third, Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action, #2 Proposed Order)(Getchey, Ronald) Modified on 9/30/2020 Per Order #10 . (iv). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Erik Villa (Joens, Timothy) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Erik Villa, (Joens, Timothy) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Erik Villa, upon Defendant Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., a New Mexico Corporation served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriel Sanchez-CT Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Erik Villa. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/21/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 500, inclusive, Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Erik Villa. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/7/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (LeBeau, Jared) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc., Loya Casualty Insurance Company. (LeBeau, Jared) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV30022 Receipt No: ACACDC-28207890 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Loya Casualty Insurance Company, Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Complaint, #2 Superior Court First Amended Complaint, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Jared Kyle LeBeau added to party Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jared Kyle LeBeau added to party Loya Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(LeBeau, Jared) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRED LOYA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Lea Joens