This case was last updated from PACER on 02/08/2020 at 07:13:06 (UTC).

Viglione v. 15 Beacon Street Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Viglione filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against 15 Beacon Street Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12486

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Viglione

Defendants

15 Beacon Street Corporation

Paul Roiff

15 Beacon Street LLC

15 Beacon Street Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew D. Epstein

Attorney at Barker, Epstein & Loscocco

176 Federal Street, Suite 502

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Catagory Form

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to 15 Beacon Street Corporation, Paul Roiff. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

8 #3

Exhibit Example of Unauthorized use of Photograph by Defendants

5 #1

Exhibit Mass. Corporation Business Entity Summary

8 #1

Exhibit Photograph of Pru Tower with words "Go Pats" reflected in Char

#6

(#6) Notice of Service of Process filed by Keith Viglione. Individual(s)/Entities served: 15 Beacon Street Corporation. (Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Unauthorized use of Photograph by Defendants

8 #2

Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate for photograph

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul Roiff, 15 Beacon Street Corp., 15 Beacon Street LLC, filed by Keith Viglione. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photograph of Pru Tower with words "Go Pats" reflected in Charles River, #2 Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate for photograph, #3 Exhibit Example of Unauthorized use of Photograph by Defendants)(Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit Amended Complaint

#5

(#5) MOTION to Correct #1 Complaint,, add a new defendant and file an amended complaint by Keith Viglione. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mass. Corporation Business Entity Summary, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons with return of service on 15 Beacon Street Corp., #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Andrew D. Epstein)(Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

5 #3

Exhibit Summons with return of service on 15 Beacon Street Corp.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paul Roiff, 15 Beacon Street Corp., 15 Beacon Street LLC, filed by Keith Viglione. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photograph of Pru Tower with words "Go Pats" reflected in Charles River, #2 Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate for photograph, #3 Exhibit Example of Unauthorized use of Photograph by Defendants)(Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Correct defendant name and file an amended complaint. Counsel shall now file the amended complaint as a separate entry on the docket. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Service of Process filed by Keith Viglione. Individual(s)/Entities served: 15 Beacon Street Corporation. (Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 01/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Correct #1 Complaint,, add a new defendant and file an amended complaint by Keith Viglione. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mass. Corporation Business Entity Summary, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons with return of service on 15 Beacon Street Corp., #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Andrew D. Epstein)(Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to 15 Beacon Street Corporation, Paul Roiff. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Epstein, Andrew) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8006747 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Keith Viglione. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photograph of Pru Tower with words "Go Pats" reflected in Charles River, #2 Exhibit Copyright Registration Certificate, #3 Exhibit Unauthorized use of Photograph by Defendants, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Catagory Form)(Epstein, Andrew) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/10/2019) (McDonagh, Christina). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.