Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2021 at 09:05:02 (UTC).

Viewpoint IP LLC v. DENSO International America, Inc

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Viewpoint IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against DENSO International America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viewpoint IP LLC

Defendant

DENSO International America, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Andrew S. Curfman

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

#10

(#10) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(mdb) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Viewpoint IP LLC as to DENSO International America, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 05/03/2021 - filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Viewpoint IP LLC. DENSO International America, Inc served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,869,853. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

1 #4

Related Cases

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against DENSO International America, Inc - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3542424.) - filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(mdb) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (dlw) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Viewpoint IP LLC as to DENSO International America, Inc. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 05/03/2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: DENSO International America, Inc answer due 5/3/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/12/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 05/03/2021 - filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Curfman for Viewpoint IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00269-MN, 1:21-cv-00270-MN, 1:21-cv-00271-MN. (kmd) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED re (6 in 1:21-cv-00269-MN), (6 in 1:21-cv-00271-MN), (6 in 1:21-cv-00270-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/4/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00269-MN, 1:21-cv-00270-MN, 1:21-cv-00271-MN (rjb) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Viewpoint IP LLC. DENSO International America, Inc served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Curfman - filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,869,853. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT - filed with Jury Demand against DENSO International America, Inc - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3542424.) - filed by Viewpoint IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Related Cases)(mal) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Viewpoint IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Denso International America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong