This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/24/2019 at 07:51:22 (UTC).

Vient v. Ogden

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 Vient filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Ogden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Preston Bailey and James P. Mazzone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

Referral Judge

James P. Mazzone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Vient

New York, NY 10011

Defendant

Ogden

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#15

14 #1

Envelope

#14

13 #1

Envelope

#13

12 #1

Envelope

#12

11 #1

Envelope

#11

10 #1

Envelope

#10

9 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

#7

#6

5 #1

Authorization Form to Receive Documents Electronically

#5

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #10 #13 MOTIONS TO COMPEL EXPEDITED DISCLOSURE AND/OR DISCOVERY; #12 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; and #14 MOTION FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 3/21/19. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SCHEDULE CONFERENCE AND ORDER by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL EXPEDITED DISCLOSURE AND/OR DISCOVERY by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmm) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ogden served on 2/5/2019 (confirmed on USPS website). (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nmm) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL EXPEDITED DISCLOSURE AND/OR DISCOVERY, by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nmm) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DENYING MOTIONS re: #5 #6 #7 Motions. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/25/2019. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Envelope re: #5 #6 #7 Letter Motions filed by Benjamin Vient. (nmm) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter MOTION for Process of Service re: Summons, filed by Benjamin Vient. (nmm) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter MOTION to Submit Filings via Filing Attachment with Email, filed by Benjamin Vient. (nmm) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter MOTION to Receive Court Documents Via Email, filed by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Authorization Form to Receive Documents Electronically) (nmm) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002083 (nmm) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ogden, filed by Benjamin Vient. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 incomplete summons submitted - did not issue, #4 Envelope) (nmm) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ogden is a litigant