This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2021 at 07:59:16 (UTC).

VideoLabs, Inc. v. Dell Technologies Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 VideoLabs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Dell Technologies Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00932

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VideoLabs, Inc.

Defendants

Dell Technologies Inc.

Dell Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Pkwy

Longview, TX 75604

David Alberti

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Marc Belloli

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Margaret Elizabeth Day

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Sal Lim

Attorney at Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli

577 Airport Blvd., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorney

Barry K. Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Coburn LLP

311 Rr 620 S, Suite 205

Austin, TX 78734-4775

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

18 #2

Proposed Order

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VideoLabs, Inc.. Dell Technologies Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Hill, Jack) Modified on 9/17/2021 (lad). (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VideoLabs, Inc.. Dell Inc. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Alberti. Attorney added for VideoLabs, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Belloli. Attorney added for VideoLabs, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of Dell Inc., Dell Technologies Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Dell Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party Dell Technologies Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VideoLabs, Inc.. Dell Technologies Inc. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Hill, Jack) Modified on 9/17/2021 (lad). (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VideoLabs, Inc.. Dell Inc. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Alberti. Attorney added for VideoLabs, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Belloli. Attorney added for VideoLabs, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sal Lim. Attorney added for VideoLabs, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margaret Elizabeth Day. Attorney added for VideoLabs, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Dell Technologies Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of D. Alberti ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15209182) by on behalf of VideoLabs, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of M. Belloli ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15209167) by on behalf of VideoLabs, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of S. Lim ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15209158) by on behalf of VideoLabs, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of M. Elizabeth Day ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15209033) by on behalf of VideoLabs, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VideoLabs, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/13/2021) (lad). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VideoLabs, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15207188), filed by VideoLabs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Hill, Jack) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/13/2021) (lad). (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dell Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry K. Shelton