This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2023 at 10:58:06 (UTC).

VideoLabs Inc et al v. Amazon.Com Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 VideoLabs Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon Com Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01167

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VideoLabs Inc

VL Collective IP LLC

Defendants

Amazon.Com Inc.

Amazon Web Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ariel A Martinez

Courtland L. Reichman

Jaime Cardenas-Navia

Michael Matulewicz-Crowley

Taylor Mauze

Tyler Lawrence Farmer

Wesley L. White

Christine E. Lehman

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica M. Kaempf

Ravi Ranganath

Saina S. Shamilov

Shreyas Kale

Donna Long

Gregory P. Adams

J. David Hadden

Johnson Kuncheria

Deron R Dacus

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#117

(#117) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#116

(#116) ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#115

(#115) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc. (Cardenas-Navia, Jaime) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#114

(#114) ORDER GRANTING #113 Motion to Stay Case Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

113 #1

Proposed Order

113 #113

Main Document

112 #1

*Restricted*

112 #112

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#111

(#111) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer on behalf of Plaintiff VideoLabs Inc. (Farmer, Tyler) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 10/28/2022)

1 #123

Exhibit 122

1 #108

Exhibit 107

1 #102

Exhibit 101

1 #99

Exhibit 98

1 #95

Exhibit 94

1 #53

Exhibit 52

1 #25

Exhibit 24

1 #20

Exhibit 19

1 #1

Main Document

585 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs Inc. (Cardenas-Navia, Jaime) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) ORDER GRANTING #113 Motion to Stay Case Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Joint MOTION to Stay Case and Notice of Settlement in Principle by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.Com Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hadden, J.) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Case transferred in from Western District of Washington per request from Judge in WDTX. Case assigned to requesting Judge. (sm3) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Case electronically transferred in from Western District of Washington; Case Number 2:22-cv-01451. (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Ariel A Martinez added for VideoLabs Inc per dkt. #111 Notice of Appearance. (SS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer on behalf of Plaintiff VideoLabs Inc. (Farmer, Tyler) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Judge Albright has requested that the case be transferred back to the Western District of Texas so that he may consider the pending motions. The court respectfully GRANTS Judge Albright's request and TRANSFERS this case back to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Taylor Mauze for Wesley L. White ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15635731) by on behalf of VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc.. (Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Taylor Mauze for Jaime Cardenas-Navia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15635711) by on behalf of VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc.. (Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Taylor Mauze for Courtland L. Reichman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15635694) by on behalf of VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc.. (Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Taylor Mauze for Christine E. Lehman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15635665) by on behalf of VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc.. (Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Mauze on behalf of VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc. (Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc.. for Amazon Web Services, Inc. (Mauze, Taylor) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/21/2022) (lad). [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc.. for Amazon.com, Inc. (Mauze, Taylor) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/21/2022) (lad). [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VL Collective IP LLC, VideoLabs, Inc.. (Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15634219), filed by VideoLabs, Inc., VL Collective IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Errata 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Exhibit 105, #107 Exhibit 106, #108 Exhibit 107, #109 Exhibit 108, #110 Exhibit 109, #111 Exhibit 110, #112 Exhibit 111, #113 Exhibit 112, #114 Exhibit 113, #115 Exhibit 114, #116 Exhibit 115, #117 Exhibit 116, #118 Exhibit 117, #119 Exhibit 118, #120 Exhibit 119, #121 Exhibit 120, #122 Exhibit 121, #123 Exhibit 122, #124 Exhibit 123, #125 Exhibit 124, #126 Exhibit 125, #127 Exhibit 126, #128 Exhibit 127, #129 Exhibit 128, #130 Exhibit 129, #131 Exhibit 130)(Mauze, Taylor) [Transferred from txwd on 10/13/2022.] [Transferred from Washington Western on 11/14/2022.] (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less