This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:40:24 (UTC).

Videira Boston Igreja Em Celulas, Inc. v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Videira Boston Igreja Em Celulas, Inc filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10730

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Videira Boston Igreja Em Celulas, Inc.

Defendants

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Alejandro Mayorkas

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Kathy A. Baran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Drago, Jr.

35 India Street

Boston, MA 02110

Alexandra Friz-Garcia

Attorney at Fonte Friz-Garcia Immigration Firm

901 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 402

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

Erin E. Brizius

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1 Courthouse Way Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Kathy A. Baran, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Brizius, Erin) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

6 #4

Return of Service

6 #3

Return of Service

6 #2

Return of Service

6 #1

Return of Service

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Return of Service)(Friz-Garcia, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit Attorney Certification

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra Fritz-Garcia Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8756550 by Videira Boston Igreja Em Celulas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Certification)(Drago, Anthony) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

*Restricted*

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Videira Boston Igreja Em Celulas, Inc. (Friz-Garcia, Alexandra) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Kathy A. Baran, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Brizius, Erin) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Return of Service)(Friz-Garcia, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alexandra Friz-Garcia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra Fritz-Garcia Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8756550 by Videira Boston Igreja Em Celulas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney Certification)(Drago, Anthony) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Mandamus against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8755378 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Videira Boston Igreja Em Celulas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Drago, Anthony) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandra Friz-Garcia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Drago, Jr.