This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2020 at 08:30:49 (UTC).

Vidal v. Safeway, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Vidal filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Safeway, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael H. Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Vidal

Defendant

Safeway, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carl Lee Post

John D. Burgess

Defendant Attorneys

William E. Weiner

David G. Hosenpud

Hank Stebbins

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Safeway, Inc. served on 2/14/2020, answer due on 3/6/2020. Certificate of Service by Ronald Vidal of Summons Issued #4 Filed by Ronald Vidal. (Burgess, John) Modified on 3/12/2020 to correct event and service dates/deadlines (ecp). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#5

(#5) Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Safeway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons Filed by Ronald Vidal. (Burgess, John) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/10/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

1 #2

Attachment

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6249772 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ronald Vidal against Safeway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment). (Burgess, John) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed as to Safeway, Inc. served on 2/14/2020, answer due on 3/6/2020. Certificate of Service by Ronald Vidal of Summons Issued #4 Filed by Ronald Vidal. (Burgess, John) Modified on 3/12/2020 to correct event and service dates/deadlines (ecp). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Safeway, Inc.. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Safeway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons Filed by Ronald Vidal. (Burgess, John) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/10/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6249772 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ronald Vidal against Safeway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment). (Burgess, John) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less