This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2022 at 08:58:05 (UTC).

Victory Solutions Inc v. United States Department of Veteran Affairs et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Victory Solutions Inc filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of Veteran Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Liles C Burke. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00269

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liles C Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victory Solutions Inc

Defendants

United States Department of Veteran Affairs

Denis McDonough

Center for Verification and Evaluation

John Perkins

United States Small Business Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Lea Lockwood

Jerome S Gabig, Jr

Richard R Raleigh, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Don B Long, III

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) FINAL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order of remand entered contemporaneously in this action and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; all parties will bear their costs and fees. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/28/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #11 Motion to Remand to Small Business Administration, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/28/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Remand

11 #11

Main Document

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victory Solutions Inc. United States Attorney's Office Northern District of Alabama served on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/30/2022. (Raleigh, Richard) Modified on 4/8/2022 (AHI) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to the United States Attorney's Office, Northern District of Alabama(AHI) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Don B Long, III on behalf of Center for Verification and Evaluation, Denis McDonough, John Perkins, United States Department of Veteran Affairs, United States Small Business Administration (Long, Don) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE in Support of #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Victory Solutions Inc. (AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Victory Solutions Inc. (AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Victory Solutions Inc (AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) FINAL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order of remand entered contemporaneously in this action and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; all parties will bear their costs and fees. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/28/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #11 Motion to Remand to Small Business Administration, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/28/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Remand to Small Business Administration's Office of Hearings and Appeals by Victory Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Remand)(Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for Tuesday, 5/17/2022, at 1:45 p.m.; dial in information will be emailed to counsel prior to telephone conference. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/19/22. (SPT ) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2022

Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER that the Telephone Conference set Thursday, 4/21/22, is CANCELED; the Telephone Conference will be reset by further order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/19/22. (SPT ) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference regarding the #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Victory Solutions Inc is set for 4/21/2022 at 1:30 p.m.; dial in information will be emailed to counsel prior to the call. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/18/22. (SPT ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victory Solutions Inc. United States Attorney's Office Northern District of Alabama served on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/30/2022. (Raleigh, Richard) Modified on 4/8/2022 (AHI) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to the United States Attorney's Office, Northern District of Alabama(AHI) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number H4601005132 (AHI) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Don B Long, III on behalf of Center for Verification and Evaluation, Denis McDonough, John Perkins, United States Department of Veteran Affairs, United States Small Business Administration (Long, Don) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RESPONSE in Support of #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Victory Solutions Inc. (AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Victory Solutions Inc. (AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Victory Solutions Inc (AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Victory Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less