This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2020 at 08:09:05 (UTC).

Victory Media Group, LLC et al v. Dawson County, Georgia

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Victory Media Group, LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dawson County, Georgia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00255

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Action Outdoor Advertising II, LLC

Victory Media Group, LLC

Defendant

Dawson County, Georgia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Franklin Lemond, Jr.

Attorney at Webb, Klase & Lemond, LLC

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Edward Adam Webb

Attorney at Webb, Klase & Lemond, LLC

Suite 480, 1900 The Exchange, Se

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorneys

Angela E. Davis

Attorney at Jarrard & Davis, LLP

222 Webb St.

Cumming, GA 30040

Paul B. Frickey

Attorney at Jarrard & Davis, LLP

222 Webb St.

Cumming, GA 30040

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to Colorado River Abstention, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay Discovery Proceedings. All discovery proceedings in this case (including but not limited to all proceedings and obligations in this action as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 and Fed.R.Civ.P. 26, i.e., scheduling conferences, joint preliminary report and discovery plan submissions, initial disclosures, 26(f) conference, start of the discovery period etc.) are stayed until thirty (30) days after the later of Court's final ruling on the Motion to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to Colorado River Abstention filed by the Defendant. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/07/2020. (rsg) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Stay Discovery Proceedings with Brief In Support by Dawson County, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Frickey, Paul) Modified on 12/4/2020 to remove duplicative wording (sk). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to Colorado River Abstention filed by Action Outdoor Advertising II, LLC, Victory Media Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (County's State Court Brief))(Webb, Edward) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark re #8 Notice of Filing: Exhibit O - 2 USB Flash Drives received by the Clerk's Office.(rsg) (rsg) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Pursuant to Colorado River Abstention with Brief In Support by Dawson County, Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Brief in Support)(Frickey, Paul) Modified on 11/23/2020 to remove duplicative wording (sk). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Of Filing by Dawson County, Georgia Notice of Manual Filing Non pdf Exhibits (Frickey, Paul) Modified on 12/1/2020, Clerk's Office received 2 USB Flash Drives (rsg). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE Of Filing by Dawson County, Georgia of the transcript of the BOC Voting Session Agenda (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Board of Commissioners)(Frickey, Paul) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Dawson County, Georgia. Discovery ends on 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Petition for Writ, #2 Exhibit B Action Applications, #3 Exhibit C Original Victory Applications, #4 Exhibit D Action Sept 4 email, #5 Exhibit E Original Victory Sept 4, #6 Exhibit F Appeal Letter Action, #7 Exhibit G Appeal Letter Victory, #8 Exhibit H Later Victory Applications, #9 Exhibit I Later Victory Denials, #10 Exhibit J Action Appeals, #11 Exhibit K Original Victory Appeal, #12 Exhibit L ORAR, #13 Exhibit M Additonal Appeals, #14 Exhibit N Dawson Meeting, #15 Exhibit O Video, #16 Exhibit P 100820 Meeting Minutes, #17 Exhibit Q Voting Session Minutes, #18 Exhibit R Denials, #19 Exhibit S Appeal Supplement Action, #20 Exhibit T Appeal Supplement Victory, #21Exhibit U Sign Ordinance)(Frickey, Paul) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 11/23/2020 to remove duplicative wording (sk). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COURT NOTICE of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Victory Media Group, LLC, Action Outdoor Advertising II, LLC. Dawson County, Georgia served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Webb, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) GENERAL ORDER 20-01 EIGHT AMENDMENT IN RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/28/2020. (dgr) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Dawson County, Georgia. (dgr) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Victory Media Group, LLC and Action Outdoor Advertising II, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-10325707) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Franklin Lemond Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. Adam Webb