This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 11:28:42 (UTC).

Victor v. Reynolds et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Victor filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Reynolds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas L. Ludington and Patricia T. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-13218

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Ludington

Referral Judge

Patricia T. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Victor

Defendants

Otsego County

Blake Huff

City of Gaylord

Kimberly Reynolds

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew John Laurila

Attorney at Rasor Law Firm

201 E 4Th St

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Defendant Attorneys

Haider A. Kazim

Attorney at Cummings, McClorey,

310 West Front Street, Suite 221

Traverse City, MI 49684-3604

G. Gus Morris

Attorney at McGraw Morris PC

2075 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 750

Troy, MI 48084

Christopher J. Raiti

Attorney at McGraw Morris P.C.

2075 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 750

Troy, MI 48084

Madeline Young

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 W Long Lake Rd, Suite 310

Troy, MI 48098

Ronald W. Chapman

Attorney at Chapman Law Group

1441 West Long Lake Road, Suite 310

Troy, MI 48098

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kimberly Reynolds waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Madeline Young appearing on behalf of Kimberly Reynolds (Young, Madeline) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Chapman appearing on behalf of Kimberly Reynolds (Chapman, Ronald) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Otsego County waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Haider A. Kazim on behalf of Otsego County. (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. City of Gaylord waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021; Blake Huff waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Morris, G.) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher J. Raiti appearing on behalf of City of Gaylord, Blake Huff (Raiti, Christopher) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: G. Gus Morris appearing on behalf of City of Gaylord, Blake Huff (Morris, G.) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Otsego County served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kimberly Reynolds served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *City of Gaylord, Blake Huff, Otsego County, Kimberly Reynolds* (NAhm) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8206473 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Otsego - County Where Action Arose: Otsego - County of 1st Defendant: Otsego. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kimberly Reynolds waiver sent on 1/11/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Madeline Young appearing on behalf of Kimberly Reynolds (Young, Madeline) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald W. Chapman appearing on behalf of Kimberly Reynolds (Chapman, Ronald) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Otsego County waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Haider A. Kazim on behalf of Otsego County. (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. City of Gaylord waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021; Blake Huff waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Morris, G.) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher J. Raiti appearing on behalf of City of Gaylord, Blake Huff (Raiti, Christopher) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: G. Gus Morris appearing on behalf of City of Gaylord, Blake Huff (Morris, G.) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Otsego County served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kimberly Reynolds served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *City of Gaylord, Blake Huff, Otsego County, Kimberly Reynolds* (NAhm) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8206473 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Otsego - County Where Action Arose: Otsego - County of 1st Defendant: Otsego. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Laurila, Andrew) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madeline Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haider A. Kazim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher James Raiti

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G. Gus Morris