This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 08:22:25 (UTC).

Vickers v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Vickers filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11717

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Ovida Vickers

Defendant

Howmedica Osteonics Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Navan Ward, Jr.

Attorney at Beasley Allen Brown Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

Po Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Howmedica Osteonics Corp served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Ward, Navan) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #6 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#6

(#6) MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

5 #6

Orders Extending Discovery Stay

5 #5

Order Aiding Private Settlement

5 #4

Fact Sheet Implementation Order

5 #3

ESI Order

5 #2

Protective Order

5 #1

Case Management Order No. 1-7

#5

(#5) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-7, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Orders Extending Discovery Stay) (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#10

(#9) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY STAY. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8422986 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mary Ovida Vickers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Navan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY STAY. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Howmedica Osteonics Corp served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Ward, Navan) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #6 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-7, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Orders Extending Discovery Stay) (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Vickers v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. In Re: Stryker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8422986 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mary Ovida Vickers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Navan) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less