This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 08:02:17 (UTC).

Vickers et al v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Vickers filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Mead Johnson Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03589

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ashley Vickers

D H

Defendants

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Abbott Laboratories

Dignity Health doing business as Bakersfield Memorial Hospital

Children's Hospital Los Angeles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M. Elizabeth Graham

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer

201 Mission St., Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony J. Anscombe

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

227 West Monroe Street, Suite 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Jonathan Matthew Baum

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

1 Market St. #3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Celeste Marie Brecht

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Bridget Kathleen O'Connor

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Caroline D. Murray

Attorney at Jones Day

555 So. Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ramanda R Luper

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Meir Feder

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281-1047

Donna W. Low

Attorney at Low McKinley Baleria, LLP

2150 River Plaza Dr., Ste. 250

Sacramento, CA 95833

Nicholas J. Leonard

Attorney at Low McKinley & Salenko LLP

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 250

Sacramento, CA 95833

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#17

(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#16

(#16) MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

15 #1

*Restricted*

15 #15

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#14

(#14) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10), re MDL No. 3026. Case Transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to STAY All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer to MDL 3026, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/12/2022. CASE STAYED. (Hall, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 07/12/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Proof of Service Corporate Disclosure Statement

11 #11

Main Document

10 #5

Proof of Service Motion to Dismiss

10 #4

Notice Request for Judicial Notice

10 #3

Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss

10 #2

Declaration Motion to Dismiss

10 #1

Memorandum Motion to Dismiss

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proof of Service

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MAILED MDL Transfer in Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RECEIVED from California Eastern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00773 (gcy) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10), re MDL No. 3026. Case Transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to STAY All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer to MDL 3026, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/12/2022. CASE STAYED. (Hall, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer to MDL 3026 by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer to MDL 3026)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Dignity Health. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Leonard, Nicholas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to DISMISS by Dignity Health. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss, #4 Notice Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proof of Service Motion to Dismiss)(Leonard, Nicholas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) ELECTRONICALLY by Abbott Laboratories: NOTICE OF LODGING OF ORDERS GRANTING MOTIONS TO STAY PENDING JPML'S FINAL DECISION ON TRANSFER IN RELATED CASES. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Defendant Abbott Laboratories' Motion to Stay Pending JPML's Final Order on Transfer (Doc. #7 ) currently set for hearing on 8/1/2022 before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston is HEREBY RESET for hearing on August 5, 2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Opposition and reply briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230 effective March 1, 2022. The parties shall appear at the hearing remotely with each party connecting either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/28/2022. (Rivera, O) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to STAY by Abbott Laboratories. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Graham, M. Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 BAK Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Maldonado, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Abbott Laboratories re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV22100810 by Abbott Laboratories. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10296046) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Addendum re Related Cases)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 7/13/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant