This case was last updated from PACER on 07/23/2019 at 07:11:11 (UTC).

ViaTech Technologies, Inc. v. Adobe Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 ViaTech Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Adobe Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11177

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ViaTech Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Adobe Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Zachary

Attorney at Bunsow De Mory LLP

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Susan G. L. Glovsky

Attorney at Hamilton Brook Smith Reynolds

155 Seaport Blvd.

Boston, MA 02210

Aaron R. Hand

Attorney at Bunsow De Mory LLP

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Denise De Mory

Attorney at Bunsow De Mory LLP

701 El Camino Real

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher G. Hanewicz

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

33 East Main Street, Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

Matthew J. Moffa

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1155 Avenue Of The Americas, 22Nd Flr.

New York, NY 10036

Wing Liang

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

3150 Porter Drive

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Elizabeth A. DiMarco

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Gregory F. Corbett

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#17) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 18, 2019 to defendant answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's #1 complaint ViaTech Technologies, Inc. answer due 7/18/2019. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

1 #3

Category Form

#2

(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Glovsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

3 #1

Certificate In Support of Motion

#3

(#9) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Denise De Mory. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

4 #1

Certificate in Support of Motion

#4

(#10) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Zachary. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Moffa on behalf of Adobe Inc. (Moffa, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#25

(#25) MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Adobe Inc.. (Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#24

(#24) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Adobe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Wing H. Liang Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7786095 by Adobe Inc..(Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher G. Hanewicz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7786059 by Adobe Inc..(Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. DiMarco on behalf of Adobe Inc. (DiMarco, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F. Corbett on behalf of Adobe Inc. (Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#16

(#17) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 18, 2019 to defendant answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's #1 complaint ViaTech Technologies, Inc. answer due 7/18/2019. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Moffa on behalf of Adobe Inc. (Moffa, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Adobe Inc.. (Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Adobe Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Wing H. Liang. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher G. Hanewicz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Wing H. Liang Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7786095 by Adobe Inc..(Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher G. Hanewicz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7786059 by Adobe Inc..(Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. DiMarco on behalf of Adobe Inc. (DiMarco, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F. Corbett on behalf of Adobe Inc. (Corbett, Gregory) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 18, 2019 to defendant answer, move, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's #1 complaint ViaTech Technologies, Inc. answer due 7/18/2019. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Zachary. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Denise De Mory. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Glovsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aaron Hand Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7701424 by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Glovsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Zachary Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7701401 by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Support of Motion)(Glovsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Denise De Mory Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7701353 by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate In Support of Motion)(Glovsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Glovsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Adobe Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7701282 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ViaTech Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Glovsky, Susan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.