This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 20:59:51 (UTC).

Viasat, Inc. v. Western Digital Corporation et al

Case Summary

On November 29, 2021, Viasat, Inc. (“Viasat” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Melissa Richards Smith of Gillam and Smith, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Kioxia Corporation and Kioxia America, Inc. (collectively, “Kioxia” or “Defendants”), seeking monetary damages and other reliefs for the Defendants’ alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No 8,615,700 (the ’700 patent) owned by the Plaintiff.

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Kioxia has infringed and is still infringing the ’700 patent, directly or indirectly, by making, using, offering for sale or selling in the United States, including in this District, certain products that implement the patents’ error-correction architecture, specifically, Kioxia’s NAND-flash-memory-containing products. Examples of potentially infringing products include Kioxia’s Enterprise SSDs, Data Center SSDs, and Client SSDs.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “On information and belief, the flash memory controller in the Kioxia’s KSG60ZSE256G SSD further contains an error detection module that is communicatively coupled with the decoder and comprises a number of sub-modules operating in parallel. Each error detection sub-module can receive a partially decoded data stream, detect whether a portion of the respective stream contains an error, and forward on the portion of the stream that contains an error to an error correction module.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Kioxia has infringed and continues to infringe at least claim 1 of the ’700 patent by making, using, selling, offering for sale, and importing the Accused Products without authority or license in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a).”

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of the Patent-in-suit.

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for a judgement in favor of Viasat that Kioxia has infringed one or more claims of the ’700 patent, directly and indirectly, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents and an award for damages sufficient to compensate Viasat for Kioxia’s infringement under 35 U.S.C. § 284 together with pre- and post-judgment interest, expenses including attorneys’ fees and costs of suit and any other relief the Court deems just.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01230

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viasat, Inc.

Defendants

Western Digital Corporation

Western Digital Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Nevin M. Gewertz

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

J. Scott McBride

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Meg E. Fasulo

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Matthew R. Ford

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Nosson D. Knobloch

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Ahmed E. Eldessouki

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

David Philip Whittlesey

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2250, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

L. Kieran Kieckhefer

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

535 Mission Street, 25Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Lillian J Mao

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

1460 El Camino Real, 2Nd Floor

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Matthew G. Berkowitz

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

1460 El Camino Real, 2Nd Floor

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Patrick R. Colsher

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

1460 El Camino Real, 2Nd Floor

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Yue (Joy) Wang

Attorney at Shearman & Sterling LLP

1460 El Camino Real, 2Nd Floor

Menlo Park, CA 94025

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#49

(#49) Proposed Protective Order by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#48

(#48) STIPULATION of Dismissal CORRECTED STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/3/2022 (sv). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

47 #1

Proposed Order

#47

(#47) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Viasat, Inc., re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Defendant Western Digital Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#46

(#46) STIPULATION of Dismissal Western Digital Corporation by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/3/2022 (sv). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#45

(#45) NOTICE JOINT NOTICE TO THE COURT CONCERNING AN EXTENSION OF THE DUE DATE FOR RESPONDING TO AND REPLYING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Viasat, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#44

(#44) MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) by Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. (Kieckhefer, L.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#43

(#43) ORDER GRANTING #42 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order Markman Hearing set for 9/30/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright, Joinder of Parties due by 11/14/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection set for 10/2/2023 09:00AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of S. McBride ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478109) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15477862), filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

59 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Proposed Protective Order by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) STIPULATION of Dismissal CORRECTED STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT WESTERN DIGITAL CORPORATION by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/3/2022 (sv). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Viasat, Inc., re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Defendant Western Digital Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) STIPULATION of Dismissal Western Digital Corporation by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/3/2022 (sv). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE JOINT NOTICE TO THE COURT CONCERNING AN EXTENSION OF THE DUE DATE FOR RESPONDING TO AND REPLYING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Viasat, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) by Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc.. (Kieckhefer, L.) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER GRANTING #42 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order Markman Hearing set for 9/30/2022 before Judge Alan D Albright, Joinder of Parties due by 11/14/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection set for 10/2/2023 09:00AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified motion type on 5/9/2022 (lad). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lillian J. Mao. Attorney added for Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of N. Knobloch ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478148) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of N. Gewertz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478134) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of M. Ford ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478121) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of S. McBride ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478109) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15477862), filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2021) (lad). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Digital Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Digital Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lillian J. Mao