This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2022 at 07:47:23 (UTC).

Viasat, Inc. v. Kioxia Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Viasat, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kioxia Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01231

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viasat, Inc.

Defendants

Kioxia Corporation

Kioxia America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

J. Scott McBride

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Matthew R. Ford

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Nevin M. Gewertz

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Nosson D. Knobloch

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Bowling

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Hawes

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Michael A. Silliman

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Spencer Packard

Attorney at Baker Botts L.L.P.

910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

Robinson Vu

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

910 Louisiana St

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley Bowling. Attorney added for Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

(#25) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robinson Vu ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15625295) by on behalf of Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Robinson) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael A. Silliman for Kioxia America, Inc.,Michael A. Silliman for Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#23

(#23) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spencer Packard. Attorney added for Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sjda) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robinson Vu on behalf of Michael Silliman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15513113) by on behalf of Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Robinson) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#23) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spencer Packard. Attorney added for Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sjda) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

7 #2

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of M. Ford ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478676) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of S. McBride ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478657) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley Bowling. Attorney added for Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robinson Vu ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15625295) by on behalf of Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Robinson) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael A. Silliman for Kioxia America, Inc.,Michael A. Silliman for Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spencer Packard. Attorney added for Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sjda) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Hawes. Attorney added for Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sjda) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Kioxia America, Inc. answer due 4/1/2022; Kioxia Corporation answer due 4/1/2022. (jc5) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE JOINT NOTICE TO THE COURT CONCERNING AN EXTENSION OF THE DUE DATE FOR RESPONDING TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation re #1 Complaint (Vu, Robinson) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order DENYING #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. After consideration of the unopposed motion, the Court DENIES the motion for failure to adhere to this Court's standing order regarding joint or unopposed requests to extend deadlines. The parties are ORDERED to instead file a Notice pursuant to this Court's standing order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Robinson) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robinson Vu on behalf of Michael Silliman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15513113) by on behalf of Kioxia America, Inc., Kioxia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vu, Robinson) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478702) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of N. Gewertz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478691) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of M. Ford ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478676) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith on Behalf of S. McBride ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15478657) by on behalf of Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Viasat, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15478536), filed by Viasat, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIOXIA America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley Bowling

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Hawes