This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:49:21 (UTC).

Viahart, LLC v. Arkview LLC d/b/a Moo Toys and d/b/a Lexivon et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Viahart, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Arkview LLC d/b/a Moo Toys and d/b/a Lexivon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Campbell Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Campbell Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viahart, LLC

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Odyssey Sourcing, LLC d/b/a Build a Brain Toy Company

Jesus Diaz Maso

Playshire, LLC

Best Choice Products, Inc. a/k/a BCP, f/k/a Sky Billiards, Inc.

iPlay iLearn, Inc.

Arkview LLC d/b/a Moo Toys and d/b/a Lexivon

Agora, LLC

Creative Kids Far East, Inc.

Jason Rothbart d/b/a Jarrby

Michael P. Dahlberg d/b/a Learning Toys 4 U

PlayLearn USA, Inc.

Ronald Almagno d/b/a Jarrby

Chickadee Business Solutions, LLC d/b/a Fox and Grapes

Comfortscape, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wendy B Mills

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Megan M O'Laughlin

Brian Christopher Nash

Alton L. Hare

Brandon James Leavitt

Gregory David Yoder

Eric Hugh Findlay

Mark Berkowitz

Debra Elaine Gunter

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

11 #2

Declaration of Gabriel Newhouse

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#11

#4

1 #12

Exhibit 10- Evidence of Infringement - Build a Brain

1 #11

Exhibit 9- Evidence of Infringement - Agora

1 #10

Exhibit 8- Evidence of Infringement - BCP

1 #8

Exhibit 6 - Evidence of Infringement - Creative Kids

1 #7

Exhibit 5- Evidence of Infringement - Fox and Grapes

1 #6

Exhibit 4- Evidence of Infringement - Moo Toys

1 #5

Exhibit 3-Evidence of Infringement - Moo Toys

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Supplement Schedule A - list of Defendants

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/29/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Viahart, LLC. (Mills, Wendy) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019

DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Best Choice Products, Inc. a/k/a BCP, f/k/a Sky Billiards, Inc. to 11/23/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019

DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Odyssey Sourcing, LLC d/b/a Build a Brain Toy Company to 11/23/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Best Choice Products, Inc. a/k/a BCP, f/k/a Sky Billiards, Inc..( Yoder, Gregory) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Odyssey Sourcing, LLC d/b/a Build a Brain Toy Company.( O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark Berkowitz on behalf of PlayLearn USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7487028. (Berkowitz, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jesus Diaz Maso to 11/11/2019; Comfortscape, LLC to 11/11/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Playshire's ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Purported Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by Viahart, LLC.(Mills, Wendy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of PlayLearn USA, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2019

DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Best Choice Products, Inc. a/k/a BCP, f/k/a Sky Billiards, Inc. to 10/24/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
10/10/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comfortscape, LLC and Jesus Diaz Maso.( Nash, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Best Choice Products, Inc. a/k/a BCP, f/k/a Sky Billiards, Inc..( Yoder, Gregory) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Odyssey Sourcing, LLC d/b/a Build a Brain Toy Company.( O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan M O'Laughlin on behalf of Odyssey Sourcing, LLC d/b/a Build a Brain Toy Company (O'Laughlin, Megan) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Playshire, LLC by Playshire, LLC.(Leavitt, Brandon) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon James Leavitt on behalf of Playshire, LLC (Leavitt, Brandon) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Agora, LLC, Arkview LLC d/b/a Moo Toys and d/b/a Lexivon, Best Choice Products, Inc. a/k/a BCP, f/k/a Sky Billiards, Inc., Chickadee Business Solutions, LLC d/b/a Fox and Grapes, Comfortscape, LLC, Creative Kids Far East, Inc., Jason Rothbart d/b/a Jarrby, Jesus Diaz Maso, Michael P. Dahlberg d/b/a Learning Toys 4 U, Odyssey Sourcing, LLC d/b/a Build a Brain Toy Company, PlayLearn USA, Inc., Playshire, LLC, Ronald Almagno d/b/a Jarrby, iPlay iLearn, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Almagno, #2 Summons(es) - Arkview, #3 Summons(es) - Best Choice, #4 Summons(es) - Chickadee, #5 Summons(es) - Comfortscape, #6 Summons(es) - Creative Kids, #7 Summons(es) - Dahlberg, #8 Summons(es) - iPlay iLearn, #9 Summons(es) - Maso, #10 Summons(es) - Odyssey Sourcing, #11 Summons(es) - Playlearn, #12 Summons(es) - Playshire, #13 Summons(es) - Rothbart)(mjc, ) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019

DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Viahart, LLC. (ksd ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019

DocketCase assigned to District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (ksd) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Original against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7426154.), filed by viahart. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule A - list of Defendants, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Registrations, #4 Exhibit 2- Trademark Registrations, #5 Exhibit 3-Evidence of Infringement - Moo Toys, #6 Exhibit 4- Evidence of Infringement - Moo Toys, #7 Exhibit 5- Evidence of Infringement - Fox and Grapes, #8 Exhibit 6 - Evidence of Infringement - Creative Kids, #9 Exhibit 7 - Evidence of Infringement and Tarnishment - Creative Kids, #10 Exhibit 8- Evidence of Infringement - BCP, #11 Exhibit 9- Evidence of Infringement - Agora, #12 Exhibit 10- Evidence of Infringement - Build a Brain, #13 Exhibit 11- Evidence of Infringement - Comfortscape, #14 Exhibit 12- Evidence of Infringement - Jarrby, #15 Exhibit 13- Evidence of Infringement - Learning Toys 4 U, #16 Exhibit 14 - Evidence of Infringement - PlayLearn, #17 Exhibit 15 - Evidence of Infringement - Playshire)(Mills, Wendy) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less