Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 07:05:14 (UTC).

Viacom International Inc. v. STICKERSUPERSHOP

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Viacom International Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against STICKERSUPERSHOP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06179

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viacom International Inc.

Defendant

STICKERSUPERSHOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

111 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

111 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/11/2019:(rao, ) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#22

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Motion hearing held on 10/11/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #15 is granted. (rao, ) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

21 #1

Declaration of service

#21

(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Viacom International Inc. as to STICKERSUPERSHOP on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of service)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#20

(#20) SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Viacom International Inc. (Document not scanned). (kp, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for preliminary injunction #15 , memorandum in support of motion #16 , exhibit #18 , notice of motion #17 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#18

(#18) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Keith A. Vogt regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

16 #1

Declaration Declaration of Keith Vogt

#15

(#15) MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

8 #4

Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of Laurie Lawrence-Dillon

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 copyrights

1 #1

Exhibit 1 trademarks

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Viacom International Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16240272. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 trademarks, #2 Exhibit 2 copyrights)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/11/2019:(rao, ) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Motion hearing held on 10/11/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #15 is granted. (rao, ) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Viacom International Inc. as to STICKERSUPERSHOP on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of service)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SURETY BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Viacom International Inc. (Document not scanned). (kp, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for preliminary injunction #15 , memorandum in support of motion #16 , exhibit #18 , notice of motion #17 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Keith A. Vogt regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #15 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM by Viacom International Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #15 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant STICKERSUPERSHOP (mc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Viacom International Inc.Emergency Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith Vogt, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to the Declaration of Keith Vogt, #3 Declaration Declaration of Laurie Lawrence-Dillon, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to the Declaration of Laurie Lawrence-Dillon)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Viacom International Inc. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Viacom International Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16240272. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 trademarks, #2 Exhibit 2 copyrights)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIACOM INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yi Bu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith A. Vogt