This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 09:52:16 (UTC).

VIAAS Inc. v. ADT LLC

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 VIAAS Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ADT LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen Cardone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01046

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen Cardone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIAAS Inc.

Defendant

ADT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Defendant Attorneys

Steven P. Tepera

Audrey Lo

Michael E. Zeliger

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADT LLC for ADT LLC. (Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#12

(#12) ADT LLCS ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ADT LLC.(Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Lo and Mr. Zeliger shall apply for admission to the Western District of Texas on or before December 15, 2022. Ms. Lo and Mr. Zeliger may represent Defendant pro hac vice in the case until they are either admitted to practice before this Court, denied admission, or removed for failure to comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (sm3) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

10 #1

Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIAAS Inc.. ADT LLC served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Cases by VIAAS Inc. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by VIAAS Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ADT LLC. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VIAAS Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADT LLC for ADT LLC. (Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ADT LLCS ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ADT LLC.(Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Lo and Mr. Zeliger shall apply for admission to the Western District of Texas on or before December 15, 2022. Ms. Lo and Mr. Zeliger may represent Defendant pro hac vice in the case until they are either admitted to practice before this Court, denied admission, or removed for failure to comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (sm3) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven P. Tepera Michael Zeliger ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16744334) by on behalf of ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven P. Tepera Audrey Lo ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16744299) by on behalf of ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: ADT LLC answer due 12/2/2022. (sm3) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint, ECF No. 1, is EXTENDED until December 2, 2022. Entered by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (KC) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tepera, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIAAS Inc.. ADT LLC served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Cases by VIAAS Inc. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by VIAAS Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ADT LLC. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VIAAS Inc.. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16609574), filed by VIAAS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less