This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 09:42:31 (UTC).

VI Technologies, LLC v. Woolpert, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 VI Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Woolpert, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00318

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VI Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Woolpert, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Wittenzellner

Attorney at Williams Simons and Landis PLLC

327 Congress Avenue, Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Jonathan L. Hardt

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Michael Simons

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Todd E. Landis

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

2633 Mckinney Ave., Suite 130

Dallas, TX 75204

Fred I. Williams

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

327 Congress Ave., Suite 490

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

John F. Bennett

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Lucas V. Haugh

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Ricardo Joel Bonilla

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Paul J. Linden

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne LLP

600 Vine Street, Suite 2800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 50000

Dallas, TX 75201

Sarika Patel

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Woolpert, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Woolpert, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay as to Paul J. Linden ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14787273) by on behalf of Woolpert, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Woolpert, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay as to John F. Bennett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14719212) by on behalf of Woolpert, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#10

Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lucas V. Haugh for Woolpert, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Woolpert, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Woolpert, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Woolpert, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul J. Linden for Woolpert, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ir) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay as to Paul J. Linden ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14787273) by on behalf of Woolpert, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Bennett for Woolpert, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lucas V. Haugh for Woolpert, Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketReset Answer Deadlines: Woolpert, Inc. answer due 5/24/2021. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be moved from April 22, 2021, to May 24, 2021 to allow Defendant sufficient time to finalize investigation of the allegations in the Complaint and respond to the allegations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Woolpert, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay as to John F. Bennett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14719212) by on behalf of Woolpert, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarika Patel on behalf of Woolpert, Inc.. Attorney Sarika Patel added to party Woolpert, Inc.(pty:dft) (Patel, Sarika) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J. McNabnay on behalf of Woolpert, Inc.. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party Woolpert, Inc.(pty:dft) (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Woolpert, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Atty Rozier. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VI Technologies, LLC. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VI Technologies, LLC. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14649702), filed by VI Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Fred) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Wittenzellner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Eric Landis