This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 11:35:33 (UTC).

Veto v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 Veto filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. McAvoy and Miroslav Lovric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00298

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. McAvoy

Referral Judge

Miroslav Lovric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maureen E. Veto

Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward J. Smith, III

Attorney at Smith, Sovik, Kendrick & Sugnet, P.C. - Syracuse Office

250 South Clinton Street, Suite 600

Syracuse, NY 13202-1252

Defendant Attorneys

Homer Baharvar Ramsey

Attorney at Herzfeld, Rubin Law Firm

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Alyssa Jordan Pantzer

Attorney at Herzfeld & Rubin, P.C.

125 Broad St

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/19/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/21/2021. (jdp ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 6. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Joinder of Parties due by 6/14/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2021. Discovery due by 4/13/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 1/13/2022. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 2/28/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 3/14/2022. Motions to be filed by 5/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/21/2021. (jdp ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER: On or before 7/19/2021, the parties shall file a status report regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 8/3/2021 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/21/2021.(jdp ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: an initial conference was held on 4/21/2021. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. A telephone conference is scheduled for 8/3/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Appearances: E. Smith, Esq., for Plaintiff; and H. Ramsey, Esq. and A. Pantzer, Esq. for Defendant. (jdp ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Ramsey, Homer) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Jordan Pantzer on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Pantzer, Alyssa) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Nissan North America, Inc..(Ramsey, Homer) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. for Nissan North America, Inc... (Ramsey, Homer) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 4/21/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/14/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Maureen E. Veto in Onondaga County Supreme Court. (pjh, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 001333/2021 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5459172) filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward J. Smith, III