This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2020 at 07:53:31 (UTC).

Vetek v. Baires Valet Parking, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Vetek filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Baires Valet Parking, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald M. Middlebrooks and Dave Lee Brannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-80526

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCISCO J. VETEK

Defendants

BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC.

PABLO N. GIMENEZ,

Pablo N. Gimenez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zandro E. Palma

Attorney at Zandro E. Palma, P.A.

9100 South Dadeland Boulevard, Suite 1500

Miami, FL 33156

Defendant Attorney

Andres H. Lopez

Attorney at The Andres Lopez Law Firm

101 Ne Third Avenue, Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by FRANCISCO J. VETEK (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#17

(#17) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC.. (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#16

(#16) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by FRANCISCO J. VETEK (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#15

(#15) Statement of: Claim by FRANCISCO J. VETEK re #13 Order of Requirements (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#14

(#14) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020., Discovery due by 8/10/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/24/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2020., Motions due by 8/24/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/28/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING FLSA SCHEDULE. (Statement of Claim due by 5/8/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE - Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 10/21/2020 1:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/30/2020)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed order

#10

(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to the Amended Complaint is currently due by April 27, 2020. In the present Motion, Defendants request a fifteen-day extension of this deadline. (DE #10 ). Defendants make this request because they recently retained counsel and because of disruption caused by Covid-19. (Id. at 2). I find good cause to grant the requested extension; Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to May 12, 2020. However, going forward, the Parties are advised that motions for extensions of time or motions to modify the scheduling order (once entered) should include specific facts to support the extension, including an explanation of what efforts have been made to comply with the deadline prior to the filing of the motion, and what specific obstacles the Parties have encountered with respect to delays or problems caused by the pandemic. In other words, future motions should be tailored to the particular facts and circumstances of this litigation, and not premised upon generalized business disruption. I reiterate that it is my intent to accommodate the Parties to the extent necessary, while also avoiding undue delay to the progress of this litigation. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/27/2020. (jdr) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to PABLO N. GIMENEZ. (lk) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

6 #1

Summon(s)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by FRANCISCO J. VETEK re #5 Amended Complaint filed by FRANCISCO J. VETEK (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#5

(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time 15 day extension to respond to the Amended Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint by BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC.. Attorney Andres H. Lopez added to party BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC. (scn) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC., PABLO N. GIMENEZ. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12665455, filed by FRANCISCO J. VETEK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PAPERLESS ORDER. On May 15, 2020, the Parties notified the Court that they have settled this matter. (DE #18 ). I congratulate the Parties on reaching an amicable resolution of this case. Under the Pretrial Scheduling Order, the Parties are required to file the appropriate closing documents within ten days of filing a notice of settlement. (DE #14 at 7). Accordingly, the Parties are directed to file the appropriate closing documents by May 26, 2020. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Parties' settlement agreement if requested to do so before closing the case. The Parties are advised that the Notice of Settlement does not stay this litigation, and therefore until the appropriate closing documents are filed, the Court will expect compliance with all pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/18/2020. (jdr) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by FRANCISCO J. VETEK (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC.. (Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by FRANCISCO J. VETEK (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Statement of: Claim by FRANCISCO J. VETEK re #13 Order of Requirements (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020., Discovery due by 8/10/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/24/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2020., Motions due by 8/24/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/28/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING FLSA SCHEDULE. (Statement of Claim due by 5/8/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE - Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 10/21/2020 1:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketReset Answer Due Deadline: BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC. response due 5/12/2020; PABLO N. GIMENEZ, response due 5/12/2020. (ls)(per DE #11) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to the Amended Complaint is currently due by April 27, 2020. In the present Motion, Defendants request a fifteen-day extension of this deadline. (DE #10 ). Defendants make this request because they recently retained counsel and because of disruption caused by Covid-19. (Id. at 2). I find good cause to grant the requested extension; Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to May 12, 2020. However, going forward, the Parties are advised that motions for extensions of time or motions to modify the scheduling order (once entered) should include specific facts to support the extension, including an explanation of what efforts have been made to comply with the deadline prior to the filing of the motion, and what specific obstacles the Parties have encountered with respect to delays or problems caused by the pandemic. In other words, future motions should be tailored to the particular facts and circumstances of this litigation, and not premised upon generalized business disruption. I reiterate that it is my intent to accommodate the Parties to the extent necessary, while also avoiding undue delay to the progress of this litigation. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/27/2020. (jdr) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time 15 day extension to respond to the Amended Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint by BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC.. Attorney Andres H. Lopez added to party BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Lopez, Andres) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by FRANCISCO J. VETEK. PABLO N. GIMENEZ, served on 4/4/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by FRANCISCO J. VETEK. BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC. served on 4/4/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to PABLO N. GIMENEZ. (lk) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by FRANCISCO J. VETEK re #5 Amended Complaint filed by FRANCISCO J. VETEK (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC., PABLO N. GIMENEZ,, filed by FRANCISCO J. VETEK.(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Pablo N Gimenez is not a listed defendant in the Complaint. (scn) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC. (scn) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BAIRES VALET PARKING, INC., PABLO N. GIMENEZ. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12665455, filed by FRANCISCO J. VETEK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zandro E. Palma