This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2020 at 08:32:52 (UTC).

Veron v. Allergan U S A Inc

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Veron filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph A. Dickson and Brian R. Martinotti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11347

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph A. Dickson

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paige Veron

Defendant

Allergan U S A Inc

In Re

IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin R Duck

Attorney at Duck Law Firm

5040 Ambassador Caffery Pkwy Ste 200

Lafayette, LA 70508

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMember Case Transferred in on 8/25/2020 from the Western District of Louisiana 6:20-cv-00932 for MDL 2921 IN RE: ALLERGAN BIOCELL TEXTURED BREAST IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketJudge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00932. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 21, directing transfer to District of New Jersey, In Re: Allergan Biocell Textured Breast Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2921. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-21) in MDL No.2921, IN RE: Allergan Biocell Textured Breast Implant Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the District of New Jersey upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Veron. Allergan U S A Inc served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (aty,Duck, Kevin) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allergan U S A Inc. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allergan U S A Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4332208) filed by Paige Veron. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kevin R Duck added to party Paige Veron(pty:pla))(aty,Duck, Kevin) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allergan PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Reeve Duck