This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2021 at 09:24:52 (UTC).

VERNON v. BIMBO BAKERIES USA

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 VERNON filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against BIMBO BAKERIES USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01128

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL VERNON

Defendant

BIMBO BAKERIES USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Holly L. Stabile

Attorney at Brant & Associates

171 Hillpointe Drive, Suite 302

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Holly Stabile

Attorney at Holly L. Stabile, Esq.

143 West Pike Street

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Defendant Attorneys

Emilie R. Hammerstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Sean P. Dawson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, Ste 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement identifying Bimbo Bakeries Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BIMBO BAKERIES USA. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Dawson on behalf of BIMBO BAKERIES USA. (Dawson, Sean) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie R. Hammerstein on behalf of BIMBO BAKERIES USA. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL VERNON. Waiver sent 8/27/21, answer due 10/26/21. (Stabile, Holly) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL VERNON. BIMBO BAKERIES USA waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Stabile, Holly) Refiled at #4 . Document hidden from public view. Modified text on 8/30/2021. (cww) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. See LCvR 5.2(B). Attorney to meet signature requirements with all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (cww) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to BIMBO BAKERIES USA (cww) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BIMBO BAKERIES USA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6673595), filed by MICHAEL VERNON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cww) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emilie R. Hammerstein