This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 18:59:02 (UTC).

Verner v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Verner filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02367

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eva Verner

Ocala, FL 34482

Respondents

Attorney General, State of Florida

Secretary, Department of Corrections

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Eva Verner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MEJ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections against Eva Verner. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MEJ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Petitioner an "Application for Leave to File a Second or Successive Habeas Corpus Petition 28 U.S.C. 2244(b) By a Prisoner in State Custody" form and close this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/19/2019. (LAM) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Vacated per 4 Order RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/19/2019. (LAM) Modified on 12/20/2019 (MEJ). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections against Eva Verner. ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MEJ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER VACATING #3 Related case order and track 1 notice. This order was entered in error. The case has been dismissed. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/20/2019. (LAM) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Vacated per 4 Order RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/19/2019. (LAM) Modified on 12/20/2019 (MEJ). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Petitioner an "Application for Leave to File a Second or Successive Habeas Corpus Petition 28 U.S.C. 2244(b) By a Prisoner in State Custody" form and close this case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/19/2019. (LAM) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Eva Verner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MEJ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.