This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 17:12:31 (UTC).

Verna IP Holdings, LLC v. BlackBerry Corporation

Case Summary

On October 05, 2021, Verna IP Holdings, LLC (“VernaIP” or “Plaintiff”), represented by William P. Ramey, III of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Blackberry Corporation (“Blackberry” or “Defendant”), seeking  injunctive relief and damages for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Patent No. 10,282,960 entitled “Digitized Voice Alerts” (“the ‘960 patent” or “Patent-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint the Plaintiff alleged that, “The ‘960 patent relates to a novel and improved methods, systems and processor-readable media for providing instant/real-time Voice alerts automatically to remote electronic devices. Blackberry maintains, operates, and administers devices/products and systems that infringe one or more claims of the ‘960 patent, including one or more of claims 1-17, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Defendant put the inventions claimed by the ‘960 Patent into service (i.e., used them); but for Defendant’s actions, the claimed-inventions embodiments involving Defendant’s products and services would never have been put into service. Defendant’s acts complained of herein caused those claimed-invention embodiments as a whole to perform, and Defendant’s procurement of monetary and commercial benefit from it.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Blackberry has and continues to induce infringement. Blackberry has actively encouraged or instructed others (e.g., its customers and/or the customers of its related companies), and continues to do so, on how to use its products and services (e.g., alert notification) such as to cause infringement of one or more of claims 1–17 of the ‘960 patent, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents. Moreover, Blackberry has known of the ’960 patent and the technology underlying it from at least the date of the filing of the lawsuit. Blackberry has and continues to contributorily infringe. Blackberry has actively encouraged or instructed others (e.g., its customers and/or the customers of its related companies), and continues to do so, on how to use its products and services.“

 

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which deals with the alleged infringement of the Patent-in-Suit owned by the Plaintiff because Blackberry has allegedly caused and will continue to cause VernaIP damage by direct and indirect infringement of (including inducing infringement of) the claims of the ’960 patent.

 

 

In its prayer for relief the Plaintiff has requested the Court to award VernaIP damages in an amount sufficient to compensate it for Defendant’s infringement of the Patent-in-Suit in an amount no less than a reasonable royalty or lost profits, together with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest; award VernaIP an accounting for acts of infringement not presented at trial and an award by the Court of additional damage for any such acts of infringement; award a permanent injunction enjoining Defendant from infringing the claims of the Patents-in Suit; and award VernaIP such other and further relief as this Court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01037

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Verna IP Holdings, LLC

Defendant

BlackBerry Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit US10282960

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#5

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Verna IP Holdings, LLC answer due 12/16/2021. (jc5) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE UNOPPOSED FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by Verna IP Holdings, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Verna IP Holdings, LLC. BlackBerry Corporation served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BlackBerry Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Verna IP Holdings, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15300377), filed by Verna IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US10282960, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKBERRY LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Ramey, III