This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:15:46 (UTC).

Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. v. Greystone Home Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Vermont Mutual Insurance Co filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Greystone Home Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01197

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vermont Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Kristen Pinsonneault and Judith Caruso

Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.

Defendants

Greystone Home Services, LLC.

Greystone Home Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart G. Blackburn

Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, Po Box 608

Windsor Locks, CT 06096

Defendant Attorney

Jeffery P. Apuzzo

Attorney at Law Office of Jeffrey P. Apuzzo

10 Waterside Drive Suite 102

Farmington, CT 06032

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Greystone Home Services, LLC.(Apuzzo, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#12

(#12) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Greystone Home Services, LLC. (Apuzzo, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery P. Apuzzo on behalf of Greystone Home Services, LLC (Apuzzo, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. Greystone Home Services, LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greystone Home Services, LLC, filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co..(Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greystone Home Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#4

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#1

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/4/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Joint Trial Memorandumjdue by 10/15/2021. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #15 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by September 1, 2021, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by October 1, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by October 31, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by October 15, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on June 4, 2021 at 3:00 pm. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/13/2020. (DeBot, B.) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Greystone Home Services, LLC.(Apuzzo, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Greystone Home Services, LLC. (Apuzzo, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery P. Apuzzo on behalf of Greystone Home Services, LLC (Apuzzo, Jeffery) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. Greystone Home Services, LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greystone Home Services, LLC, filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co..(Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#8) ENTERED IN ERROR (Duplicative to Doc. #7)) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BASIS FOR FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Plaintiff has filed a diversity complaint against a limited liability company. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by reference to the citizenship of each of its members, rather than by the state of incorporation and principal place of business. See, e.g., Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012); Handelsman v. Bedford Village Ltd. Partnership, LLC, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000). The complaint fails to identify the citizenship of each of the members of the defendant limited liability company. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by August 25, 2020, that properly identifies the membership and citizenship of each of the members of the limited liability company defendant. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 08/19/2020. (DeBot, B.) Modified on 8/19/2020 (Freberg, B). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BASIS FOR FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Plaintiff has filed a diversity complaint against a limited liability company. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by reference to the citizenship of each of its members, rather than by the state of incorporation and principal place of business. See, e.g., Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012); Handelsman v. Bedford Village Ltd. Partnership, LLC, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000). The complaint fails to identify the citizenship of each of the members of the defendant limited liability company. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by August 25, 2020, that properly identifies the membership and citizenship of each of the members of the limited liability company defendant. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/19/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greystone Home Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2020; Discovery due by 2/16/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Greystone Home Services, LLC.. (Blackburn, Stuart) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Greystone Home Services, LLC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6036506.), filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.(Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 8/18/2020 to update party (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERMONT MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GREYSTONE HOMES INC is a litigant