This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:01:07 (UTC).

Vermillion v. Juul Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Vermillion against Juul Labs, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05286

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NOAH RYAN VERMILLION

Noah Vermillion

Defendant

Juul Labs, Inc.

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc.. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13644018). Filed by Noah Vermillion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling filed by Juul Labs, Inc., Noah Vermillion. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Van Schwing and G. Charles Nierlich, Joshua D. Dick, Peter C. Squeri, Kelsey J. Helland (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

14 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Noah Vermillion (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Juul Labs, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#8

(#8) Notice of Pendency or Other Action or Proceeding by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#13

(#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Juul Labs, Inc. Filed by Noah Vermillion. (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019) Modified on 9/20/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Noah Vermillion To JUUL Labs, Inc. (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/10/2019) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#10

(#10) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling. Joint status report due by 10/30/2019. Signed on 9/4/2019.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: Vermillion v. JUUL Labs, Inc., 4:19-cv-05286-DMR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Juul Labs, Inc. Filed by Noah Vermillion. (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019) Modified on 9/20/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Noah Vermillion (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2019) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Noah Vermillion To JUUL Labs, Inc. (De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 9/10/2019) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling. Joint status report due by 10/30/2019. Signed on 9/4/2019.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Ruling filed by Juul Labs, Inc., Noah Vermillion. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Pendency or Other Action or Proceeding by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Juul Labs, Inc. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for Juul Labs, Inc.. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Van Schwing and G. Charles Nierlich, Joshua D. Dick, Peter C. Squeri, Kelsey J. Helland (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 9/3/2019) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Juul Labs, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Juul Labs, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13644018). Filed by Noah Vermillion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(De La Cerda, Peter) (Filed on 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.