This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:15:57 (UTC).

Verica v. Veitinger et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Verica filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Veitinger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00759

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily Verica

Defendants

Geoffrey M. Parker

David Bonita

David Hirsch

Gerrit Klaerner

Sandra I. Coufal

Robert J. Alpern

Klaus R. Veitinger

Kathryn Falberg

Nominal Defendant

Tricida, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Verification

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 3 in 21-cv-759-RGA; D.I. 9 in 21-cv-205-RGA) Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/20/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00205-RGA, 1:21-cv-00759-RGA(nms) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order, by Emily Verica. (Klauder, David) Modified on 7/20/2021 (nms). (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Robert J. Alpern, David Bonita, Sandra I. Coufal, Kathryn Falberg, David Hirsch, Gerrit Klaerner, Geoffrey M. Parker, Klaus R. Veitinger - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3624202.) - filed by Emily Verica. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst