This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2020 at 09:47:04 (UTC).

Verhines v. Uber Technologies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Verhines filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01886

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Spencer VERHINES

Christopher James

Defendant

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon Liss-Riordan

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Anne R. Kramer

Attorney at Lichten and Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant Attorneys

Theane Evangelis

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Heather Lynn Richardson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Blaine H. Evanson

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joshua Seth Lipshutz

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#81

(#81) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#80

(#80) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/6/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:30 AM. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 30 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. ,br>Plaintiff Attorney: Shannon Liss-Riordan. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Blaine Evanson, Heather Richardson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#79

(#79) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (51) Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-06462-EMC, 3:20-cv-01886-EMC.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#77

(#77) STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/6/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#76

(#76) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#75

(#75) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 22, 2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Christopher James, Spencer Verhines, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#74

RESTRICTED

#73

(#73) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Proceedings held via Zoom Webinar. Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2020; Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2020 in case 3:19-cv-06462-EMC. Court takes matter under submission. Further Case Management Conference set 5/6/2020 at 10:30 AM and will proceed via Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 4/30/2020. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 1 Hour. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Shannon Liss-Riordan, Anne Kramer. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Blaine Evanson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #5 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#3

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice (Other), #6 Notice of Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#2

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice (Other), #6 Notice of Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration of B. Rosenthal

#1

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, was filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/6/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:30 AM. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 30 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. ,br>Plaintiff Attorney: Shannon Liss-Riordan. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Blaine Evanson, Heather Richardson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2020) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (51) Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-06462-EMC, 3:20-cv-01886-EMC.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docket(#78) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 5/6/2020 AT 10:30 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/81203139581?pwd=V2NVTnIySW5OSzkwYVpSdGN5R2tVZz09Meeting ID: 812-0313-9581Password: 010900Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. Th ere is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/6/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 22, 2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Christopher James, Spencer Verhines, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-22-2020, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (47 in 3:20-cv-01886-EMC) Transcript Order, (47 in 3:19-cv-06462-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2020 10:30 AM. via ZOOM Webinar. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Proceedings held via Zoom Webinar. Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2020; Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2020 in case 3:19-cv-06462-EMC. Court takes matter under submission. Further Case Management Conference set 5/6/2020 at 10:30 AM and will proceed via Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 4/30/2020. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 1 Hour. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Shannon Liss-Riordan, Anne Kramer. Defendant Attorneys: Theane Evangelis, Heather Richardson, Blaine Evanson. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/ 12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#9) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/1/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, was filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice (Other), #6 Notice of Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Richardson (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Corrected) (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #5 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd. for Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Uber Technologies, Inc. . (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Class Action Complaint from Superior Court of California, Cty of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-20-583684. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14289941). Filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 3/17/2020) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less