This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 09:44:25 (UTC).

Andrea Otanez Verdugo v. Capstone Logistics, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Andrea Otanez Verdugo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Capstone Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03141

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREA OTANEZ VERDUGO

Defendants

CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC

DOES 1 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James M Treglio

Mark D Potter

Defendant Attorneys

Justin T Curley

Ian Thompson Long

Eric W May

Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.

Jennifer A. Riley

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, PENDING MEDIATION #20 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

20 #1

Proposed Order

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Capstone Logistics, LLC answer now due 6/13/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC.(May, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/23/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33298174) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33298304) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application re #14 . (sbou) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric W May counsel for Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. Adding Eric W. May as counsel of record for Capstone Logistics, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attorney Eric W May added to party CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC(pty:dft))(May, Eric) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC identifying Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC, identifying Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc.. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

1 #4

Proof of Service

1 #3

Declaration OF MEGHAN NAGEL

1 #2

Declaration OF MARK SEYMOUR

1 #1

Exhibit 1-2

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, PENDING MEDIATION #20 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (iv) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 7, 2022 to August 18, 2022 filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(May, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Capstone Logistics, LLC answer now due 6/13/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC.(May, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/23/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33298174) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33298304) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application re #14 . (sbou) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ORDER on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Viceby Judge Fernando M. Olguin. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC, designating Eric W May as local counsel. granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. (rolm) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ORDER on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC, designating Eric W May as local counsel. granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley (rolm) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33298304) filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (May, Eric) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer A. Riley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33298174) filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (May, Eric) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1446(d) filed by Defendants Capstone Logistics, LLC. (May, Eric) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gerald L. Maatman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric W May counsel for Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. Adding Eric W. May as counsel of record for Capstone Logistics, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Capstone Logistics, LLC. (Attorney Eric W May added to party CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC(pty:dft))(May, Eric) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Andrea Otanez Verdugo in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/15/2022, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC identifying Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC, identifying Capstone Logistics Holdings, Inc.. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV09270 Receipt No: ACACDC-33267010 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Declaration OF MARK SEYMOUR, #3 Declaration OF MEGHAN NAGEL, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Justin T Curley added to party CAPSTONE LOGISTICS, LLC(pty:dft))(Curley, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less