This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 10:14:15 (UTC).

Verdin v. Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 Verdin filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-10425

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Verdin

Defendant

Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip J. Gordon

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9729646 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Francisco Verdin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form Category Form)(Gordon, Philip) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Form Category Form

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc. served on 3/15/2023, answer due 4/5/2023. (Gordon, Philip) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Francisco Verdin. (Gordon, Philip) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Francisco Verdin. (Gordon, Philip) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc. served on 3/15/2023, answer due 4/5/2023. (Gordon, Philip) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Keurig Dr Pepper, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9729646 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Francisco Verdin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form Category Form)(Gordon, Philip) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less