This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2019 at 16:05:18 (UTC).

Verde Investments Incorporated v. Browndorf et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Verde Investments Incorporated filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Browndorf. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01055

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Verde Investments Incorporated

Defendants

Matthew C Browndorf

DCM-P1 LLC

Plutos Sama LLC

Sarina Browndorf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Louis Sklar

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothberger Christie LLP - Tucson Office

1 S Church Ave., Ste. 2000

Tucson, AZ 85701-1611

Susan M Freeman

Attorney at Lewis & Roca LLP

40 N Central Ave

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4429

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Errata re: #11 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy of Defendant Plutos Sama, LLC by Plaintiff Verde Investments Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Plutos Sama, LLC by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#10

(#10) AMENDED ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#9

(#9) **AMENDED BY DOC. 10* ORDER : Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA) Modified on 2/19/2019 (TCA). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

7 #3

Summons

7 #2

Summons

7 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Matthew C Browndorf, Sarina Browndorf, DCM-P1 LLC, Plutos Sama LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16541160. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1055-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

3 #3

Summons

3 #1

Summons

1 #3

Exhibit C - F

1 #2

Exhibit A - B

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16541160 filed by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - B, #3 Exhibit C - F)(KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Errata re: #11 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy of Defendant Plutos Sama, LLC by Plaintiff Verde Investments Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Plutos Sama, LLC by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED ORDER: Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) **AMENDED BY DOC. 10* ORDER : Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the timerequired by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA) Modified on 2/19/2019 (TCA). (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/15/2019. (TCA) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Matthew C Browndorf, Sarina Browndorf, DCM-P1 LLC, Plutos Sama LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Verde Investments Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16541160. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1055-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16541160 filed by Verde Investments Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - B, #3 Exhibit C - F)(KEP) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plutos Sama, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DCM-P1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan M Freeman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey L Sklar