This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:12:45 (UTC).

Verchow v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by Verchow against Atrium Medical Corporation in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00874

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Verchow

Defendants

Getinge AB

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Atrium Medical Corporation

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 10/2/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Unger Davis, Katherine) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1853702 filed by Scott Verchow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Richardson, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 10/2/2019. Answer Follow Up on 12/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Unger Davis, Katherine) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-874-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1853702 filed by Scott Verchow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Richardson, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.