This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:14:29 (UTC).

Verch v. Mixpanel, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Verch filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Mixpanel, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01185

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marco Verch

Defendant

Mixpanel, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Paul Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Marco Verch (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT by Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#6

(#6) IT IS ORDERED that Verch shall move for clerks entry of default against MixPanel or file a report apprising the Court of the status of this case on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Verch. Mixpanel, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 12/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Mixpanel, Inc.. (cj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 12/5/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #4

Copyright Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12923044). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 12/5/2019) (cj). (Attachment 4 replaced and flattened on 12/5/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Settlement by Marco Verch (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT by Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) IT IS ORDERED that Verch shall move for clerks entry of default against MixPanel or file a report apprising the Court of the status of this case on or before January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Verch. Mixpanel, Inc. served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 12/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Mixpanel, Inc.. (cj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marco Verch. (cj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Marco Verch. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 12/5/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12923044). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 12/5/2019) (cj). (Attachment 4 replaced and flattened on 12/5/2019) (cj). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.