This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2019 at 07:15:59 (UTC).

Verbil v. Mesa Airlines Inc

Case Summary

On 06/30/2019 Verbil filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Mesa Airlines Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-03812

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher J Verbil

Defendant

Mesa Airlines Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Jerome Muller

Attorney at Ventura Hersey & Muller, LLP

1506 Hamilton Avenue

San Jose, CA 95125

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Muller, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mesa Airlines Inc ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13481589.). Filed byChristopher J Verbil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muller, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Mesa Airlines Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/26/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Mesa Airlines Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/15/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Muller, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mesa Airlines Inc ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13481589.). Filed byChristopher J Verbil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muller, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2019) (Entered: 06/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.