This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2019 at 07:45:13 (UTC).

Ventura Martinez et al v. Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Ventura Martinez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01373

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arely Mejia

Luis Hernandez Gonzalez

Norberto Herrera

Mercedes Martinez Ventura

Rene Ventura Martinez

Carlos Alfredo Herrera

Jose Arciniega

Steve Garcia

Lesme Lemus

Defendants

Damien LeTyrant

Damien Le Tyrant

Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC

Loic Feillet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Zelikovitz

Attorney at DCWAGELAW

519 H Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carlos Alfredo Herrera, Jose Arciniega, Steve Garcia, Luis Hernandez Gonzalez, Norberto Herrera, Lesme Lemus, Mercedes Martinez Ventura, Arely Mejia, Rene Ventura Martinez (Zelikovitz, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

1 #2

Summons (3)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Loic Feillet, Damien LeTyrant and Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8004104.), filed by Carlos Alfredo Herrera, Jose Arciniega, Norberto Herrera, Lesme Lemus, Arely Mejia, Mercedes Martinez Ventura, Steve Garcia, Rene Ventura Martinez, Luis Hernandez Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice and DIRECTING the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/3/2019. (lmys, Chambers) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carlos Alfredo Herrera, Jose Arciniega, Steve Garcia, Luis Hernandez Gonzalez, Norberto Herrera, Lesme Lemus, Mercedes Martinez Ventura, Arely Mejia, Rene Ventura Martinez (Zelikovitz, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Loic Feillet, Damien LeTyrant and Panorama Loic Feillet Artisan Baker, LLC.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/10/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8004104.), filed by Carlos Alfredo Herrera, Jose Arciniega, Norberto Herrera, Lesme Lemus, Arely Mejia, Mercedes Martinez Ventura, Steve Garcia, Rene Ventura Martinez, Luis Hernandez Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (3))(Zelikovitz, Justin) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.