This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 07:18:55 (UTC).

Michael John Ventrone v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Michael John Ventrone filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and John E. McDermott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07709

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael John Ventrone

Defendants

Amazon.com, Inc.

Amazon.com Services, Inc.

Amazon LAX5

Amazon LGB6

Golden State FC, LLC

Sarah Martinez

Leslie Jones

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carney R Shegerian

Attorney at Shegerian and Associates Inc.

11520 San Vicente Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Anthony Nguyen

Attorney at Shegerian and Associates Inc.

11520 San Vicente Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Lee R Feldman

Attorney at Feldman Browne APC

15200 West Sunset Boulevard Suite 217

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Mark Lim

Attorney at Shegerian and Associates Inc

11520 San Vicente Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Defendant Attorneys

Miranda Rowley

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

One Market

San Francisco, CA 94105-1596

Jason S Mills

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

Karen Y Cho

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3132

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV30445 Receipt No: ACACDC-34198948 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Leslie J Jones, Amazon.com, Inc., Sarah Martinez, Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Declaration of Lezlie Jones in Support of Removal of Action to Federal Court) (Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon LAX5(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon LGB6(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon.com Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Golden State FC, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Leslie J Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Sarah Martinez(pty:dft))(Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer

1 #3

Declaration of Lezlie Jones in Support of Removal of Action to Federal Court

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Sarah Martinez, Lezlie Jones. (Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Lezlie Jones, Sarah Martinez, (Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Lezlie Jones(pty:dft))(Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Lezlie Jones, Sarah Martinez. (Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Lezlie Jones, Sarah Martinez, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 served on October 21, 2022. (Mills, Jason) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, Defendants have failed to meet their burden to demonstrate the Court's diversity jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court remands this action to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 22STCV30445, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#11

(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (aco) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#12

(#12) Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL-REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Receipt of LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL-REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT. (aco) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (aco) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, Defendants have failed to meet their burden to demonstrate the Court's diversity jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court remands this action to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 22STCV30445, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Leslie Jones, Sarah Martinez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/18/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Does, Golden State FC, LLC, Leslie Jones, Sarah Martinez. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Michael John Ventrone. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/19/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Lezlie Jones, Sarah Martinez, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 served on October 21, 2022. (Mills, Jason) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Lezlie Jones, Sarah Martinez. (Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Lezlie Jones, Sarah Martinez, (Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Lezlie Jones(pty:dft))(Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC, LLC, Sarah Martinez, Lezlie Jones. (Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 22STCV30445 Receipt No: ACACDC-34198948 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Golden State FC, LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Leslie J Jones, Amazon.com, Inc., Sarah Martinez, Amazon LAX5, Amazon LGB6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Declaration of Lezlie Jones in Support of Removal of Action to Federal Court) (Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon LAX5(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon LGB6(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon.com Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Golden State FC, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Leslie J Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Miranda Rowley added to party Sarah Martinez(pty:dft))(Rowley, Miranda) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less