This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2022 at 08:10:41 (UTC).

Venice Park Condominium Association, Inc. v. The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Venice Park Condominium Association, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jonathan Goodman and Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20986

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Venice Park Condominium Association, Inc.

Defendant

The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy Theodore Schilling

Attorney at Schilling & Silvers, PLLC

1700 Nw 64Th Street, Suite 460

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Alexander Bekker

Attorney at Frontier Law Group

P.O. Box 30592

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33303

Cole Mathias Gale

200 Se 6Th Street, Suite 100-E

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Cole Isdell

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Drive Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Thomas Anthony Keller

Attorney at Butler Pappas Weihmuller Katz Craig

777 S Harbour Island Boulevard, One Harbour Place Suite 500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/10/2023 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 4/4/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#13

(#13) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company Designation of Lead Counsel and Email Addresses (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Cole Isdell on behalf of The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Isdell, Erin) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#9

(#9) REPLY to Affirmative Defenses by Jeremy Schilling. (Schilling, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Theodore Schilling on behalf of Jeremy Schilling. Attorney Jeremy Theodore Schilling added to party Jeremy Schilling(pty:conpla). (Schilling, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent Munich Re Group for The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

5 #1

Exhibit 1

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#3

(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Alexander Bekker, mailing date April 1, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Notice of Intent

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Sunbiz

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/10/2023 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 4/4/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (ls) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company Designation of Lead Counsel and Email Addresses (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Cole Isdell on behalf of The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Isdell, Erin) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Affirmative Defenses by Jeremy Schilling. (Schilling, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Theodore Schilling on behalf of Jeremy Schilling. Attorney Jeremy Theodore Schilling added to party Jeremy Schilling(pty:conpla). (Schilling, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Munich Reinsurance America, Inc., Corporate Parent Munich Re Group for The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Alexander Bekker, mailing date April 1, 2022, (pt) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - 11th Judicial Circuit) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15524821, filed by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sunbiz, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Intent, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Keller