This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/27/2022 at 18:58:16 (UTC).

Venequip, S.A. v. Caterpillar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Venequip, S A filed an Other lawsuit against Caterpillar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06297

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Respondent

CATERPILLAR, INC.

In Re

VENEQUIP, S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

In Re Attorney

Gabriel Aizenberg

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit 4

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re Response, #13 Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit Four to Respondent's Response and Objection to Petitioner's Section 1782 Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Ryan, Brendan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

13 #4

Exhibit 4

13 #3

Exhibit 3

13 #2

Exhibit 2

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) RESPONSE by Respondent Caterpillar, Inc. to miscellaneous case, #1 Response and Objection to Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Permitting Venequip, S.A. to Issue Subpoenas for the Taking of Depositions and the Production of Documents From Caterpillar, Inc. for use in Swiss Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ryan, Brendan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion by Nicole Silver for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 is granted. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion to set briefing schedule on Section 1782 application #9 is granted: response will be due on 1/18/2022; reply will be due on 2/8/2022. Notice of motion date of 1/11/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18931942. (Silver, Nicole) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by VENEQUIP, S.A. Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782(a) Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0752-18905505. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re Response, #13 Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit Four to Respondent's Response and Objection to Petitioner's Section 1782 Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Ryan, Brendan) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE by Respondent Caterpillar, Inc. to miscellaneous case, #1 Response and Objection to Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 Permitting Venequip, S.A. to Issue Subpoenas for the Taking of Depositions and the Production of Documents From Caterpillar, Inc. for use in Swiss Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ryan, Brendan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion by Nicole Silver for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 is granted. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint motion to set briefing schedule on Section 1782 application #9 is granted: response will be due on 1/18/2022; reply will be due on 2/8/2022. Notice of motion date of 1/11/2022 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Caterpillar, Inc. by Brendan Edward Ryan (Ryan, Brendan) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by In Re Venequip, S.A. to set a briefing schedule - Joint (Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Venequip, S.A. (Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Respondent Caterpillar, Inc. (lxk, ) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Motion by Gabriel Aizenberg for presentment of before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/11/2021 at 10:00 AM. (Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18931942. (Silver, Nicole) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion by Daniel Pulecio-Boek for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Venequip, S.A. #4 is granted. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18929625. (Pulecio Boek, Daniel) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jj, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (exr, ) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for In Re VENEQUIP, S.A. by Gabriel Aizenberg (Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM miscellaneous case, #1 by VENEQUIP, S.A. (Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by VENEQUIP, S.A. Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782(a) Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0752-18905505. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aizenberg, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriel Aizenberg