This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2019 at 07:06:39 (UTC).

Erika Venegas v. Renal Treatment Centers California, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Erika Venegas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Renal Treatment Centers California, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05755

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erika Venegas

Defendants

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive

Renal Treatment Centers California, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa Mariko Watanabe-Peagler

Attorney at Rise Law Firm PC

5900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90036-5028

Nehemiah Choi

Attorney at Rise Law Firm PC

5900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90036-5013

Defendant Attorneys

Momo Emily Takahashi

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Leila S Nourani

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A - Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Filing Notice o

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #8

Declaration of Marilyn Vu-Tran in support of Notice of Removal

1 #7

Exhibit F - State Bar Profile for Nehemiah Choi

1 #6

Exhibit E - State Bar Profile for Lisa Watanabe-Peagler

1 #5

Exhibit D - Defendant's Answer to Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit C - Notice of Case Management Conference

1 #3

Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Declaration of Leila Nourani in support of Notice of Removal

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Renal Treatment Centers California, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 served on July 3, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Takahashi, Momo) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Renal Treatment Centers California, Inc. Filed in State Court on 6/26/19 Submitted with attachment 5 Exhibit D to notice of removal #1 .(car) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Erika Venegas, upon Defendant DaVita, Inc. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Becky DeGeorge - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/4/19 Submitted with attachment 3 Exhibit B to notice of removal #1 (car) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, DaVita, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Erika Venegas. Filed in State Court on 5/31/19 Submitted with attachment 2 Exhibit A to notice of removal #1 (car) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant DaVita, Inc.. (Takahashi, Momo) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DaVita, Inc., (Takahashi, Momo) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant DaVita, Inc. (Takahashi, Momo) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DaVita, Inc.. (Takahashi, Momo) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV18965 Receipt No: 0973-24020116 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant DaVita, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leila Nourani in support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Case Management Conference, #5 Exhibit D - Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - State Bar Profile for Lisa Watanabe-Peagler, #7 Exhibit F - State Bar Profile for Nehemiah Choi, #8 Declaration of Marilyn Vu-Tran in support of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Momo Emily Takahashi added to party DaVita, Inc.(pty:dft))(Takahashi, Momo) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renal Treatment Centers - California Inc. dba DaVita is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Momo Emily Takahashi