This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2021 at 08:50:16 (UTC).

Venegas et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Venegas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Amazon com Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03269

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jose Luis Lomeli Venegas

Martha Nuno de Venegas

Maria Venegas

Defendants

Amazon.com Inc

Amazon Advertising L L C

Amazon Capital Services Inc

Amazon Capital L L C

Amazon Construction L L C

Amazon Data Services Inc

Amazon Development Center U S Inc

Amazon Electric L L C

Amazon Logistics Inc

Amazon Payments Inc

Amazon Properties L L C

Amazon Technologies Inc

Amazon Web Services Inc

Amazon.com Sales Inc

Amazon.com Services Inc

Amazon.com Services L L C

M J S Enterprises Inc

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramez Fayez Shamieh

Attorney at Shamieh Law

1111 W Mockingbird Ln Ste 1160

Dallas, TX 75247

Defendant Attorneys

Henry Jake Rodriguez

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al (NO)

650 Poydras St Ste 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Donald Goodwin Cassels, III

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al (NO)

650 Poydras St Ste 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jonathan Joseph Segarra

Attorney at Wilson Elser et al (NO)

650 Poydras St Ste 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Amend First Amended Complaint with opposition filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Twix Report, #3 Exhibit Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit Police Report, #5 Exhibit Police Report)(aty,Cassels, Donald) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Continental Insurance Co. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding #12 MOTION to Amend First Amended Complaint with opposition. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 11/8/2021.(crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dilshod Abdurasulov, Amazon Advertising L L C, Amazon Capital L L C, Amazon Capital Services Inc, Amazon Construction L L C, Amazon Data Services Inc, Amazon Development Center U S Inc, Amazon Electric L L C, Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon Payments Inc, Amazon Properties L L C, Amazon Technologies Inc, Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Sales Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc, Amazon.com Services L L C, Felix Smith Borges, Jimmys Truck Sales, M J S Enterprises Inc, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, Western National Insurance Co, National Continental Insurance Co with Jury Demand filed by Martha Nuno de Venegas, Jose Luis Lomeli Venegas, Maria Venegas.(crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Initial Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/15/2021. (crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Amend First Amended Complaint with opposition by Jose Luis Lomeli Venegas. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend, #2 Proposed pleading Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(aty,Shamieh, Ramez) Modified on 10/17/2021 to modify docket text (Whidden, C). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JUDGMENT granting #9 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Ohio Security Insurance Company are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/13/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Henry Jake Rodriguez for Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company by Jose Luis Lomeli Venegas. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order of Voluntary Dismissal of Def. Ohio Security Insurance Company)(aty,Shamieh, Ramez) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent Plaintiffs' Initial Complaint by Jose Luis Lomeli Venegas. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Initial Complaint, #2 Proposed pleading Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)(aty,Shamieh, Ramez) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER filed as a NOTICE of Compliance by Amazon.com Inc re #5 Removal Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Attorneys/Parties, #2 Exhibit List of All Documents in State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Certification Regarding Completeness of State Court Record)(aty,Cassels, Donald) Modified docket text on 10/12/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for H. Jake Rodriguez to Enroll as Counsel by Amazon.com Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cassels, Donald) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/14/2021. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Donald Goodwin Cassels, III on behalf of Amazon Development Center U S Inc, Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Services L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Amazon Development Center U S Inc, Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - PDF of document found attached to #1 Notice of Removal, attachment #2.(Attorney Jonathan Joseph Segarra added to party Amazon Development Center U.S., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Joseph Segarra added to party Amazon Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Joseph Segarra added to party Amazon.com Services, LLC(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Amazon Advertising, LLC answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Capital Services, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Data Services, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Development Center U.S., Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Logistics, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Payments, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Properties, L.L.C. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Technologies, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon Web Services, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon.com Sales, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon.com Services, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021; Amazon.com Services, LLC answer due 9/17/2021; State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co answer due 9/17/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - PDF of document found attached to #1 Notice of Removal, attachment#2. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:21-cv-3269 from Alexandria Division to Monroe Division. New Case Number 3:21-cv-3269. Case assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com Inc. (aty,Cassels, Donald) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 6th JDC Madison Parish, Case Number 2021-000128 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4815090) filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Receipt and Certificate of Title, #4 Proposed order Proposed Removal Order)(Attorney Donald Goodwin Cassels, III added to party Amazon.com Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Cassels, Donald) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Payments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.com Sales, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON CAPITAL SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMAZON DEVELOPMENT CENTER U.S. INC. is a litigant