This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2020 at 08:51:55 (UTC).

Veloso et al v. Armanino LLP

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Veloso filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Armanino LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20525

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rodrigo Veloso

Emilie Veloso

Defendant

Armanino LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Robert Seitz

Attorney at Mase Mebane & Briggs, P.A.

800, 2601 South Bayshore Drive

Miami, FL 33133

Curtis Jay Mase

Attorney at Mase Mebane & Briggs, P.A.

2601 South Bayshore Drive, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33133

Defendant Attorneys

Seth Adam Kolton

Attorney at Shendell & Pollock PL

Suite 150, 2700 N Military Trail, Suite 218-A

Boca Raton, FL 33431-7392

Matthew Anthony Tornincasa

Attorney at Shendell & Pollock PL

2700 N Military Trail, Suite 150

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint by Armanino LLP. Attorney Matthew Anthony Tornincasa added to party Armanino LLP(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tornincasa, Matthew) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION to Stay by Armanino LLP. Attorney Seth Adam Kolton added to party Armanino LLP(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolton, Seth) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armanino LLP, filed by Rodrigo Veloso, Emilie Veloso.(Seitz, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rodrigo Veloso, Emilie Veloso. Armanino LLP waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Seitz, William) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Armanino LLP. (jao). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12404391, filed by Rodrigo Veloso, Emilie Veloso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Seitz, William) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint by Armanino LLP. Attorney Matthew Anthony Tornincasa added to party Armanino LLP(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tornincasa, Matthew) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Stay by Armanino LLP. Attorney Seth Adam Kolton added to party Armanino LLP(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolton, Seth) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armanino LLP, filed by Rodrigo Veloso, Emilie Veloso.(Seitz, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rodrigo Veloso, Emilie Veloso. Armanino LLP waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Seitz, William) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Armanino LLP. (jao). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12404391, filed by Rodrigo Veloso, Emilie Veloso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Seitz, William) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMANINO LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP; is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Robert Seitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Curtis Jay Mase