This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:42:52 (UTC).

Velez v. Neocis, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Velez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Neocis, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23161

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Velez

Defendant

Neocis, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at PereGonza The Attorneys, PLLC

1414 Nw 107Th Ave, Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Juan J. Perez

1414 Nw 107Th Ave., Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Defendant Attorney

Tiffany Lynn Anderson

Attorney at Leon Cosgrove, LLC

255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 800

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Neocis, Inc.. (Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robin Velez. Replies due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#11

(#11) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Neocis, Inc. (Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit Magistrate Selection

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Robin Velez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Magistrate Selection)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Neocis, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#8

(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before September 17, 2020, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Neocis, Inc., filed by Robin Velez.(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neocis, Inc. (Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#4

(#4) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Neocis, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Copy of State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Complaint and State Court Filed Documents

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Neocis, Inc.. (Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robin Velez. Replies due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Neocis, Inc. (Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Robin Velez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Magistrate Selection)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #6 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Neocis, Inc.. Responses due by 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before September 17, 2020, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles See attached document for full details. (hs01) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in light of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Neocis, Inc., filed by Robin Velez.(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neocis, Inc. (Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Neocis, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13269586, filed by Neocis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and State Court Filed Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 - Copy of State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Anderson, Tiffany)(No Answer or Motion to dismiss filed) Text Modified on 7/30/2020 (amb). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less