This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:42:44 (UTC).

Velez v. JC Machine Works, Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Velez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against JC Machine Works, Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20098

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Velez

Defendant

JC Machine Works, Corp. a Florida Profit Corporation doing business as JC Machine Shop

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at PereGonza The Attorneys, PLLC

1414 Nw 107Th Ave, Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Defendant Attorney

Steven Adam Siegel

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

450 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to JC Machine Works, Corp.. (pcs) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND RESPONSE IN FLSA CASE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Velez. JC Machine Works, Corp. served on 1/11/2022, response/answer due 2/1/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Statement of: Claim by Robin Velez re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Order of Requirements (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES, JC Machine Works, Corp. response/answer due 2/10/2022, Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default due 2/17/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by JC Machine Works, Corp.. (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Exhibit Arbitration Agreement

#13

(#13) ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION, STAYING CASE, AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE Motions terminated: #12 Agreed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case filed by JC Machine Works, Corp.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION, STAYING CASE, AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE Motions terminated: #12 Agreed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case filed by JC Machine Works, Corp.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Agreed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case by JC Machine Works, Corp.. Responses due by 3/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement)(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. The Response shall be filed by February 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by JC Machine Works, Corp.. (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the #1 complaint is due on or before February 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/4/2022. (jd01) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Order, Set Response/Answer Due Deadline, #1 Complaint by JC Machine Works, Corp.. Attorney Steven Adam Siegel added to party JC Machine Works, Corp.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES, JC Machine Works, Corp. response/answer due 2/10/2022, Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default due 2/17/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of: Claim by Robin Velez re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Order of Requirements (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Velez. JC Machine Works, Corp. served on 1/11/2022, response/answer due 2/1/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND RESPONSE IN FLSA CASE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to JC Machine Works, Corp.. (pcs) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JC Machine Works, Corp.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15300730, filed by Robin Velez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Adam Siegel