This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2020 at 11:42:13 (UTC).

Velazquez-Vazquez v. Triple-S Vida, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Velazquez-Vazquez filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Triple-S Vida, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01364

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez

Defendant

Triple-S Vida, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio LLC

Po Box 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Disclosure filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for extension of time until October 15, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez upon Triple-S Vida, Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (mg) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

7 #2

Summons

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Triple-S Vida, Inc., filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Summons).(mg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (mg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Triple-S Vida, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Category Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Triple-S Vida, Inc., filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez, Pro Se. Service due by 10/26/2020, (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Exhibit). (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2020: #5 Summons) (mg). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Disclosure filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for extension of time until October 15, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez upon Triple-S Vida, Inc. served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (mg) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Triple-S Vida, Inc., filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Summons).(mg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (mg) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Triple-S Vida, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Triple-S Vida, Inc., filed by Jose Gregorio Velazquez-Vazquez, Pro Se. Service due by 10/26/2020, (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Exhibit). (mg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2020: #5 Summons) (mg). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triple S Vida, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez