This case was last updated from PACER on 12/23/2019 at 07:20:25 (UTC).

Christian Velazquez v. Panda Motors, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Christian Velazquez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Panda Motors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02031

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Velazquez

Defendant

Panda Motors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell S Thompson, IV

Attorney at Thompson Consumer Law Group PLLC

5235 East Southern Avenue D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Defendant Attorneys

Ali Parvaneh

Attorney at Madison Law APC

17702 Mitchell North

Irvine, CA 92614

James Steven Sifers

Attorney at Madison Law APC

17702 Mitchell North

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - RISC

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez, (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Panda Motors, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020, filed by Defendant Panda Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney James Steven Sifers added to party Panda Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sifers, James) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24663148 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC) (Attorney Russell S Thompson, IV added to party Christian Velazquez(pty:pla))(Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT PANDA MOTORS, INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS [L.R. 8-3], #11 by Judge James V. Selna. Defendant shall have up to and including January 8, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. (es) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Panda Motors, Inc. (et) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#9

(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/21/2020. (lb) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez, upon Defendant Panda Motors, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Duane Aleman, Registered Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT PANDA MOTORS, INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS [L.R. 8-3], #11 by Judge James V. Selna. Defendant shall have up to and including January 8, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. (es) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Panda Motors, Inc. answer now due 1/8/2020, filed by Defendant Panda Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney James Steven Sifers added to party Panda Motors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sifers, James) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez, upon Defendant Panda Motors, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Duane Aleman, Registered Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/21/2020. (lb) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Panda Motors, Inc. (et) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez, (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24663148 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christian Velazquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC) (Attorney Russell S Thompson, IV added to party Christian Velazquez(pty:pla))(Thompson, Russell) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.